Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Smith, Matthew, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Sturm, Charles, Sturm, Charles Alfred, against Microvast Inc, Wu, Yang, Zheng, Yanzhuan, Zheng, Yanzhuan "Leon", represented by Ballard, Glenn Arlen Jr., Gibson, Laura, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts District with LAUREN REEDER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 05, 2018 |
CategoryOther Employment |
Last RefreshedApril 16, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseDistrict |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed On Agreement Of Parties |
Exhibit 01
Date: October 22, 2021Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel
Date: October 22, 2021Exhibit 02B
Date: October 22, 2021Letter to Clerk
Date: October 22, 2021ORDER SIGNED COMPELLING DISCOVERY IN PART, SEE ORDER
Date: October 25, 2021Letter to Court
Date: October 25, 2021Exhibti C
Date: October 25, 2021Plaintiff Reply in Support of his Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: October 25, 2021Defendants' Fifth Amended Answer and Third Amended Counterclaim
Date: October 26, 2021Defendants Motion in Limine
Date: October 29, 2021Defendants Designation of Deposition Testimony of Plaintiff Matthew Smith
Date: October 29, 2021Defendants Exhibit List
Date: October 29, 2021Charge of the Court
Date: October 29, 2021Defendants' Witness List
Date: October 29, 2021Party/Attorney List and Trial Scheduling Issues
Date: October 29, 2021Defendants' Pre-Trial Submissions
Date: October 29, 2021Proposed Plaintiff's Proposed Jury Charge
Date: October 29, 2021Plaintiff's Witness List
Date: October 29, 2021Plaintiff's Deposition Excerpts to be used at Trial
Date: October 29, 2021Plaintiffs Exhibit List
Date: October 29, 2021Party Attorney List
Date: October 29, 2021Plaintiff's Trial Scheduling Notice
Date: October 29, 2021Plaintiffs Second Supplemental Disclosure of Testifying Experts
Date: October 29, 2021Plaintiffs Amended Exhibit List
Date: November 01, 2021Plaintiffs Motion in Limine
Date: November 01, 2021Plaintiff's Objections to Defendants' Designation of Deposition for Plaintiff Matthew Smith
Date: November 01, 2021Notice of Appearance of Additional Counsel
Date: November 01, 2021Letter to Judge
Date: November 01, 2021Return of Service
Date: November 03, 2021Defendants Amended Exhibit List
Date: November 01, 2021Defendants' Amended Witness List
Date: November 01, 2021ORDER SIGNED GRANTING BIFURCATE TRIAL
Date: November 04, 2021ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: November 22, 2021DCA Generic Letter
Date: December 01, 2021Plaintiffs Second Amended Exhibit List
Date: January 06, 2022Strike List
Date: August 30, 2022Plaintiffs Final Trial Exhibit List
Date: September 08, 2022NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS - NO FINAL ORDER-JCVF4S
Date: September 14, 2022Joint Motion to Dismiss
Date: November 11, 2022DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES
Date: November 17, 2022Charge of the Court
Date: September 14, 2022COURT REPORTER EXHIBIT LIST
Date: October 09, 2023Second Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: November 08, 2022Proposed Order on Joint Motion to Dismiss
Date: November 11, 2022Defendants' Motion for Entry of Final Judgment
Date: September 19, 2022Defendants Requested Instruction No.4
Date: September 14, 2022First Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: November 04, 2022Defendants Requested Instruction No.2
Date: September 14, 2022Envelope
Date: September 14, 2022Defendants Requested Instruction No.3
Date: September 14, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: September 19, 2022Proposed Final Judgment
Date: September 19, 2022Defendants Requested Instruction No.1
Date: September 14, 2022Plaintiffs Amended Motion In Limine
Date: January 06, 2022Defendants Third Amended Exhibit List
Date: January 07, 2022Plaintiff's Third Supplemental Response to Defendants' Request for Disclosure
Date: January 07, 2022Defendants Fourth Amended Exhibit List
Date: January 07, 2022ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: January 20, 2022DCA Generic Letter
Date: March 30, 2022TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER
Date: March 30, 2022Proposed Order on Defendants' First Supplemental Motion in Limine
Date: April 22, 2022Defendants' Rule 193.7 Notice
Date: April 21, 2022Defendants' First Supplemental Motion in Limine
Date: April 22, 2022Defendants Fifth Amended Exhibit List
Date: April 22, 2022ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: May 05, 2022Proposed Order on Defendants' Motion to Quash Subpoena of Noel Kersh
Date: August 29, 2022ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: May 10, 2022TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER
Date: July 20, 2022Defendant's Motion to Quash Subpoena of Noel Kersh
Date: August 29, 2022Envelope
Date: August 30, 2022Plaintiff Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Defendants' Expert Witness Jeff Mayes
Date: October 08, 2021Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Jeff Mayes
Date: October 21, 2021Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: October 21, 2021Return of Service
Date: October 12, 2021Exhibit A
Date: October 08, 2021Notice of Appearance of Counsel
Date: October 19, 2021Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Charles Schwartz
Date: October 21, 2021Exhibit C
Date: October 20, 2021Plaintiff Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: October 20, 2021Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Jeff Mayes
Date: October 21, 2021Exhibit A
Date: October 20, 2021Exhibit B
Date: October 20, 2021TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER
Date: October 20, 2021Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: October 22, 2021Notice of Oral Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel
Date: October 21, 2021PROTECTIVE ORDER (CIVIL) ORD SGND
Date: August 03, 2020Plaintiff Response to Non-Party Ogletree's Motion for Protective Order
Date: July 31, 2020ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: August 28, 2020ORDER SIGNED COMPELLING DISCOVERY
Date: August 11, 2020DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: September 02, 2020ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: September 02, 2020Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Disclosure of Testifying Experts
Date: March 01, 2021DCA Generic Letter
Date: March 08, 2021Reporter's Certificate Oral Videoconference Deposition of Yang Wu Febrauary 11, 2021
Date: March 18, 2021ORDER SIGNED DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION
Date: March 23, 2021Exhibit A
Date: March 22, 2021ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: April 05, 2021Proposed Order on Defendants' Motion for Continuance
Date: August 10, 2021Notice of Hearing on Defendats' Motion for Continuance
Date: August 10, 2021DCA Generic Letter
Date: August 11, 2021Defendants' Motion for Continuance
Date: August 10, 2021Defendats Third Amended Answer and First Amended Counterclaim
Date: August 13, 2021Exhbit B
Date: August 19, 2021Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion for Continuance
Date: August 19, 2021Exhibit A
Date: August 19, 2021Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Response to Defendants' Request for Disclosure
Date: August 13, 2021Defendants Corrected Third Amended Answer and First Amended Counterclaim
Date: August 16, 2021Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Motion for Continuance
Date: August 20, 2021ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: August 23, 2021Defendants Fourth Amended Answer and Second Amended Counterclaim
Date: September 07, 2021ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: August 24, 2021DCA Generic Letter
Date: October 06, 2021Defendants' Motion in Limine
Date: October 29, 2021Defendants' Designation of Deposition Testimony of Plaintiff Matthew Smith
Date: October 29, 2021Defendants' Exhibit List
Date: October 29, 2021Charges of the Court
Date: October 29, 2021Plaintiff's Amended Exhibit List
Date: November 01, 2021Plaintiff's Motion in Limine
Date: November 01, 2021Return of Service Supoena
Date: November 03, 2021Defendants' Amended Exhibit List
Date: November 01, 2021Return of Service Subpoena
Date: January 04, 2022Service Return Subpoena
Date: January 04, 2022Plaintiff's Second Amended Exhibit Limine
Date: January 06, 2022Plaintiff's Amended Motion In Limine
Date: January 06, 2022Return of Service Subpoena
Date: January 06, 2022Defendants' Fourth Amended Exhibit List
Date: January 07, 2022Defendants' Third Amended Exhibit List
Date: January 07, 2022Defendants' Fifth Amended Exhibit List
Date: April 22, 2022Subpoena - Noel Kersh
Date: April 13, 2022Subpoenas - Glenn A Ballard Jr
Date: August 17, 2022Subpoena - Yanzhuan Zheng
Date: August 17, 2022Subpoena Duces Tecum
Date: August 26, 2022Plaintiff's Final Trial Exhibit List
Date: September 08, 20222022-09-19 Defs Ntc of Hearing
Date: September 19, 2022Exhibit 1
Date: October 22, 2021Exhibit 2
Date: October 22, 2021Exhibit 2B
Date: October 22, 2021Plaintiff's Exhibit List
Date: October 29, 2021Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Disclosure of Testifying Experts
Date: October 29, 2021TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER
Date: January 28, 2019Letter to Court
Date: October 22, 2019Proposed Order Granting Defendants' First Motion for Continuance and Motion to Compel
Date: February 11, 2019Defendants' First Motion for Continuance and Motion to Compel
Date: February 11, 2019PROTECTIVE ORDER (CIVIL) ORD SGND
Date: February 13, 2019Defendants' Second Amended Answer and Counterclaim
Date: August 09, 2019TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER
Date: July 25, 2019ORDER DENYING MOTION TO QUASH DOCUMENT(S) SIGNED
Date: July 23, 2019DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: February 22, 2019ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: February 22, 2019Defendants First Amended Answer and CounterClaim
Date: July 10, 2019Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Quash and Motion for Protection
Date: July 22, 2019Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Compel
Date: February 13, 2019Proposed Order Denying Defendants' First Motion for Continuance and Motion to Compel
Date: February 15, 2019Plaintiff's Original Petition
Date: February 05, 2018Civil Process Request
Date: February 12, 2018DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: March 20, 2018Defendants' Original Answer and requests for disclosure
Date: March 12, 2018Plaintiff's Anti-Slapp Motion To Dismiss
Date: September 06, 2019Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Traditional and No-Evidence Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: September 17, 2019Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Traditional and No Evidence Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: September 23, 2019Plaintiff's Reply in Support of His Anti-Slapp Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims
Date: September 20, 2019Letter to Judge Reeder
Date: September 30, 2019DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: October 30, 2019ORDER SIGNED DENYING MOTION T0 DISMISS
Date: October 23, 2019ORDER SIGNED DENYING FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: October 23, 2019DCA Generic Letter
Date: April 15, 2020ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: June 16, 2020ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: October 30, 2019ORDER SIGNED DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION
Date: January 24, 2020DCA Generic Letter
Date: March 16, 2020ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: April 02, 2020TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER
Date: March 05, 2020ORDER SIGNED COMPELLING PRODUCTION
Date: January 21, 2020DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: June 11, 2020Agreed Motion for Continuance and for Entry of Agreed Docket Control Order
Date: June 08, 2020ORDER SIGNED DENYING PROTECTION
Date: July 23, 2019Defendats' Third Amended Answer and First Amended Counterclaim
Date: August 13, 2021Defendants' Corrected Third Amended Answer and First Amended Counterclaim
Date: August 16, 2021Defendants' Fourth Amended Answer and Second Amended Counterclaim
Date: September 07, 2021TRIAL.PREPARATION.ORDER
Date: January 28, 2019TRIAL.PREPARATION.ORDER
Date: July 25, 2019TRIAL.PREPARATION.ORDER
Date: March 05, 2020Proposed Order Dismissing Defendants' Counterclaims with Prejudice
Date: September 23, 2019Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion for Protection
Date: July 22, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT REPORTER EXHIBIT LIST | |
November 21, 2022 |
ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (MOTION FOR) Law Day Docket |
||
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event | DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES | |
November 11, 2022 |
ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (MOTION FOR) Law Day Docket PER NEW NOTICE |
||
November 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Joint Motion to Dismiss | |
November 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order on Joint Motion to Dismiss | |
November 11, 2022 |
ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (MOTION FOR) Law Day Docket |
||
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Second Amended Notice of Hearing | |
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | First Amended Notice of Hearing | |
October 31, 2022 |
DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION (MOTION TO) (TRCP 165A) Trial Coordinators Docket |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.