Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Parsons, Roger D (In His Capacity As Trustee Of The Ll & E Royalty Tr, filed a(n) Condominium - Property case against Bank Of New York Mellon, Bank Of New York Mellon Trust Company N A, Breitburn Energy Partners Lp, Breitburn Management Company Llc, Conocophillips Company, (total of 12) See All represented by Gannaway, Geoffrey A, Kim, John H., Harvin, Andrew R., Thompson Iii, Joseph G., Thompson, Joseph G. Iii, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts District with JACLANEL M. MCFARLAND presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 12, 2015 |
CategoryHomeowners Association |
Last RefreshedMay 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeCondominium |
Filing Court HouseDistrict |
Exhibit 03
Date: November 15, 2023{Proposed} Order
Date: April 19, 2024Exhibit 04
Date: November 15, 2023Joint Nonsuit and Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice
Date: April 19, 2024Notice of Oral Hearing
Date: October 31, 2023Declaration of Gardner W. Walkup, Jr.
Date: November 15, 2023Exhibit O
Date: November 15, 2023Proposed Order Granting Breitburn Parties' Plea to the Jurisdiction
Date: November 15, 2023Declaration of Angela Peterson
Date: November 15, 2023Exhibit 4
Date: November 15, 2023Cover Letter to Proposed Order
Date: November 15, 2023Exhibit 6
Date: November 15, 2023Exhibit 7
Date: November 15, 2023Exhibit 3
Date: November 15, 2023Exhibit 2
Date: November 15, 2023Parsons' Response to the Breitburn Parties Motion to Exclude
Date: November 15, 2023Exhibit 1
Date: November 15, 2023First Amended Notice of Oral Hearing
Date: November 15, 2023Exhibit B
Date: November 16, 2023Exhibit A
Date: November 16, 2023Breitburn - Declaration and Verification of Roy Mitchell 11-16-2023
Date: November 16, 2023Third-Party Defendants' Supplemental Joint Motion in Limine
Date: November 20, 2023Proposed Order
Date: November 20, 2023Envelope
Date: November 27, 2023Strike List
Date: November 27, 2023Exhibit E
Date: November 27, 2023The Breitburn Parties Second Amended Motions In Limine Reflecting Agreements Of Parties
Date: November 27, 2023Exhibit B
Date: November 27, 2023Proposed Order Denying Breitburn's Plea to the Jurisdiction
Date: November 27, 2023Parsons' Response to the Breitburn Parties' Plea to the Jurisdiction
Date: November 27, 2023Proposed Order on the Breitburn Parties' Rule 166(g) Motion on Tort Claims
Date: November 27, 2023Exhibit C
Date: November 27, 2023Parsons' Response to the Breitburn Parties' Rule 166(g) Motion on Defendant's Tort Claims
Date: November 27, 2023Parsons' Response to BBOP's Rule 166 Motion and BBOP's Motion for Reconsideration
Date: November 27, 2023Parsons' First Amended Trial Exhibit List
Date: November 27, 2023ORD SGND AUTHORIZING JURY COMPENSATION
Date: November 28, 2023The Breitburn Parties' Motion to Bifurcate Exemplary Damages
Date: November 27, 2023Proposed Order
Date: November 27, 2023Exhibit D
Date: November 27, 2023The Breitburn Parties' Bench Brief Related To The Trust's " Commingling" Claims
Date: December 08, 2023Proposed Order on BBOP's Rule 166 Motion
Date: November 27, 2023Exhibit 8
Date: December 11, 2023The Breitburn Parties' List of Preadmitted Exhibits
Date: November 28, 2023Exhibit 9
Date: December 11, 2023Exhibit 7
Date: December 11, 2023Exhibit 6
Date: December 11, 2023Exhibit 5
Date: December 11, 2023Exhibit 1
Date: December 11, 2023Breitburn Parties' 7th Amended Trial Exhibit List
Date: December 12, 2023Exhibit 4
Date: December 11, 2023Exhibit 2
Date: December 11, 2023Exhibit 3
Date: December 11, 2023Proposed Agreed Order Refunding Defendant Roger D. Parsons, In His Capacity as Trustee
Date: January 16, 2024ORDER SIGNED REFUNDING CASH DEPOSIT
Date: February 26, 2024Ex. 1-Bond Receipt - 4.30.21
Date: January 16, 2024Breitburn Parties' Objection to and Motion to Exclude Opinions of Mr. Saul Solomon
Date: December 11, 2023DCA Generic Letter
Date: March 04, 2024Parsons' Trial Exhibit List
Date: September 21, 2023Reporter Certification Oral Videotaped Deposition of Quentin Mimms
Date: October 13, 2023Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Breitburn Operating LP's and the Breitburn Third Party Defendants'
Date: September 22, 2023Exhibit A
Date: September 21, 2023Parsons' Trial Witness List
Date: September 21, 2023Third-Party Defendants' Joint Trial Exhibit List
Date: September 21, 2023The Breitburn Parties' Motions in Limine Updated to Reflect Agreements of Parties
Date: September 22, 2023Proposed Order on Third-Party Defendants' Joint Objections to Parsons' Trial Exhibits
Date: September 22, 2023Notice of Hearing - Various Motions
Date: October 31, 2023Proposed Order Denying Breitburn's Motion to Exclude
Date: November 15, 2023Exhibit K
Date: November 15, 2023Exhibit F
Date: November 15, 2023Third-Party Defendants' Joint Objections to Parsons' Trial Exhibits
Date: September 21, 2023Parsons Objections Breitburn Exhibits
Date: September 21, 2023Exhibit B
Date: September 21, 2023Exhibit B
Date: September 19, 2023Rule 166 Motion and Motion for Reconsideration
Date: September 19, 2023Proposed Order
Date: September 20, 2023Proposed Order on Parsons' Motion in Limine
Date: September 21, 2023Notice of Oral Hearing
Date: September 19, 2023Proposed Order
Date: September 19, 2023Notice Of Oral Hearing
Date: September 19, 2023Parsons' Motion in Limine
Date: September 21, 2023Exhibit A
Date: September 19, 2023Exhibit 2
Date: September 19, 2023Exhibit 1
Date: September 19, 2023The Breitburn Parties' Rule 166 Motion to Dismiss the LL&E Trust's Tort Claims
Date: September 19, 2023Proposed Order on Parsons' Motion in Limine
Date: September 19, 2023Parsons' Motion in Limine
Date: September 19, 2023Return of Service re; The Louisiana Land And Exploration Company LLC
Date: March 28, 2023MANDATE
Date: August 02, 2023Reporter's Certification Deposition of Sarah Newell May 24, 2023
Date: August 10, 2023Certificate
Date: August 24, 2023Exhibit 3
Date: September 18, 2023Exhibit 5
Date: September 18, 2023Response to Motion to Strike Continuance
Date: September 15, 2023Exhibit 2
Date: September 18, 2023Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Breitburn Operating LP's Motion to Equalize Peremptory Challenges
Date: September 11, 2023Notice Of Oral Hearing
Date: September 13, 2023Parson's Motion Exclude Late-Produced Documents Or Alternatively For Continuance
Date: September 13, 2023Parsons' First Amended Preliminary Trial Exhibit List
Date: September 18, 2023Notice of Hearing on Motion to Equalize
Date: September 12, 2023Exhibit A
Date: September 11, 2023Proposed Order GRANTING Motion to Equalize
Date: September 11, 2023Proposed Order
Date: September 15, 2023Exhibit 3
Date: September 19, 2023ORDER SIGNED DENYING FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: September 12, 2023PROPOSED ORDER
Date: September 13, 2023Cover Letter on Proposed Order
Date: September 11, 2023Proposed Order
Date: September 18, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: September 19, 2023Agreed Motion For Trial Continuance
Date: September 16, 2022Reporter's Certificate Oral And Videotaped Deposition Of Gregg Lamb April 13, 2023
Date: January 26, 2023Exhibit 01
Date: July 22, 2022Notice Of Remote Status Conference
Date: January 06, 2023Order (Fourteenth Court of Appeals)
Date: February 10, 2023Notice from Fourteenth Court of Appeals
Date: February 21, 2023Reporters Certification Deposition Of Roger Parsons March 29, 2022
Date: May 11, 2022Exhibit 02
Date: July 22, 2022Reporter's Certificate-The Deposition Of Erik Abraham
Date: June 02, 2022Exhibit 03
Date: April 28, 2022The Deposition Of Shrikant Mehta- Reporter's Certificate
Date: June 02, 2022Request for Issuance of Service
Date: March 15, 2023Notice of Remote Status Conference
Date: September 08, 2022Return of Service
Date: March 28, 2023ORDER SIGNED GRANTING PREFERENTIAL TRIAL SETTING
Date: September 22, 2022Substitute Memorandum Opinion (Fourteenth Court of Appeals)
Date: July 26, 2022Proposed Order Granting Agreed Motion for Trial Continuance
Date: September 16, 2022DOCKET CONTROL ORDER-JCVO02
Date: September 30, 2022Memorandum Opinion (Fourteenth Court of Appeals)
Date: February 28, 2023Exhibit 10
Date: April 28, 2022Exhibit 02
Date: April 28, 2022Exhibit 01
Date: April 28, 2022Exhibit 02
Date: April 18, 2022Amended Notice of Oral Hearing
Date: April 27, 2022Exhibit 06
Date: April 28, 2022Exhibit 18
Date: April 28, 2022Notice of Resumption of Hearing
Date: April 26, 2022Exhibit 03
Date: April 22, 2022Exhibit 01
Date: April 22, 2022(Proposed) Order
Date: April 18, 2022Memorandum Opinion (Fourteenth Court of Appeals)
Date: April 19, 2022Exhibit 05
Date: April 28, 2022Exhibit 03
Date: April 18, 2022ORDER DISBURSING REGISTRY FUNDS SIGNED
Date: April 25, 2022Exhibit 09
Date: April 28, 2022Exhibit 01
Date: April 18, 2022Exhibit 02
Date: April 22, 2022Exhibit 15
Date: April 28, 2022Exhibit 04
Date: April 18, 2022Exhibit 07
Date: April 28, 2022Ex. 3
Date: April 18, 2022Exhibit 04
Date: April 28, 2022Exhibit 06
Date: April 18, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: April 27, 2022Ex. 1
Date: April 18, 2022Exhibit 16
Date: April 28, 2022Exhibit 08
Date: April 28, 2022Exhibit 05
Date: April 18, 2022Ex. 2
Date: April 18, 2022Proposed Agreed Order
Date: April 22, 2022Notice Of Remote Oral Hearing
Date: April 26, 2022Exhibit 14
Date: April 28, 2022Exhibit 17
Date: April 28, 2022Attorney Cover Letter
Date: April 07, 2022Exhibit 10
Date: April 18, 2022Exhibit 09
Date: April 18, 2022Exhibit 07
Date: April 18, 2022Exhibit 11
Date: April 18, 2022Exhibit 13
Date: April 18, 2022Exhibit 08
Date: April 18, 2022Exhibit 12
Date: April 18, 2022Proposed Order
Date: April 07, 2022Ex. 3
Date: April 18, 2022Return of Service re; The Louisiana Land And Exploration Company LLC
Date: March 28, 2023ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: September 22, 2022PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES
Date: April 01, 2022Exhibit A
Date: March 30, 2022Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice - Proposed Order-Final
Date: March 31, 2022Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice-Final
Date: March 31, 2022Exhibit C
Date: March 30, 2022Exhibit B
Date: March 30, 2022Ex. 9
Date: April 18, 2022Ex. 8
Date: April 18, 2022Ex. 7
Date: April 18, 2022Ex. 5
Date: April 18, 2022Ex. 6
Date: April 18, 2022Ex. 4
Date: April 18, 2022Ex. 13
Date: April 18, 2022Ex. 10
Date: April 18, 2022Ex. 11
Date: April 18, 2022Ex. 12
Date: April 18, 2022Exhibit 3
Date: April 22, 2022Final Agreed Order on Motion to Vacate Order for Deposit into Registry
Date: April 22, 2022Exhibit 2
Date: April 22, 2022Exhibit 1
Date: April 22, 2022Motion to Vacate Order for Deposit into Registry
Date: April 22, 2022Exhibit 9
Date: April 28, 2022Exhibit 8
Date: April 28, 2022Exhibit 7
Date: April 28, 2022Exhibit 6
Date: April 28, 2022Exhibit 5
Date: April 28, 2022Exhibit 4
Date: April 28, 2022Exhibit 3
Date: April 28, 2022Exhibit 1
Date: April 28, 2022Exhibit 2
Date: April 28, 2022Response To Motion To Exclude Late-Produced Evidence Or Alternatively For Sanctions
Date: April 28, 2022Exhibit 19
Date: March 28, 2022Proposed Order
Date: March 28, 2022Reporter's Certification Deposition Of Roger Parsons
Date: May 11, 2022PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING AGREED MOTION CONTINUE AND FOR STATUS
Date: September 16, 2022Notice Of Status Conference
Date: January 06, 2023EX 10_WF statement 03.31.21
Date: March 28, 2022EX 1_Joint Stipulated Undisputed Facts 05.12.21
Date: March 28, 2022(Proposed) Order
Date: March 28, 2022EX 5-B_Jay Field Conveyance FL
Date: March 28, 2022EX 6_Valukas demand ltr 04.14.14
Date: March 28, 2022EX 4_Partnership Agreement 06.01.83
Date: March 28, 2022EX 5-A_Jay Field Conveyance AL
Date: March 28, 2022EX 3_Trust Agreement 06.01.83
Date: March 28, 2022EX 18_CP Supp Resp to RFD 10.01.21
Date: March 28, 2022EX 2_TI Hearing Transcript 05.14.2021
Date: March 28, 2022Sworn Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Date: November 12, 2015Tolling-Rule 11 Agreement-Final
Date: May 17, 2016Exhibit 5 (Order)
Date: January 14, 2016Notice of intent to dismiss-No trial setting
Date: February 07, 2017The Breitburn Parties Verified First Amended Original Answer
Date: June 01, 2018Plaintiff Breitburn Operating LP's First Amended Petition
Date: June 01, 2018DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: November 26, 2018Second Agreed Motion Setting of Trial Date and Entry of New Docket Control Order
Date: November 19, 2018Proposed Confidentiality Agreement and Stipulated Protective Order
Date: September 11, 2018Joint Motion for Entry of Confidentiality Agreement and Stipulated Protective Order
Date: September 11, 2018Rule 11 Agreement
Date: November 16, 2018NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)
Date: May 17, 2016Quantum Resources Managment, LLCs Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: May 07, 2018DCA Generic Letter
Date: March 13, 2019PARTIAL DISMISSAL OTHER ORDER SIGNED
Date: December 07, 2018DCA Generic Letter
Date: April 10, 2019Civil Process Request Form
Date: March 20, 2019DCA Generic Letter
Date: April 16, 2019Maverick Natural Resources, LLC's Original Answer
Date: July 12, 2019- Rule 11 Agreement
Date: May 15, 2019Rule 11 Agreement
Date: May 15, 2019Exhibit C Docket Control Order
Date: October 01, 2019Filng letter
Date: October 09, 2019Maverick Natural Resources LLCs First Amended Answer
Date: December 20, 2019Proposed Order
Date: January 06, 2020Exhibit A - Parsons 1st Amd Disclosure Responses
Date: October 01, 2019Proposed Order
Date: October 01, 2019Proposed Order
Date: December 30, 2019Exhibit B - Parsons 2nd Amd Disclosure Responses
Date: October 01, 2019Stifel, Nicholas & Co, Inc. Traditional Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: October 01, 2019Exh. 11 - Solomon Declaration in Support of Application for Registry
Date: April 28, 2021Proposed Order
Date: March 19, 2020Proposed Order
Date: November 07, 2019Parsons' Reply In Support Of Motion To Compel
Date: May 29, 2020Proposed Order
Date: May 29, 2020The Breitburn Parties Verified Second Amended Answer
Date: December 20, 2019Proposed Order
Date: October 21, 2019Plaintiff Breitburn Operating LP's Second Amended Petition
Date: December 20, 2019Stifel's Response to the Objections of Roger D. Parsons to Summary Judgment Evidence
Date: January 06, 2020Proposed Order
Date: May 26, 2020Exh. 9 Dillard Response Letter
Date: April 28, 2021Breitburn Parties Response to Defendants Second and Expedited Motion to Compel
Date: June 30, 2021Exhibit - 6 2015_04_14 Letter
Date: April 29, 2021Order (Proposed)
Date: May 12, 2021Exhibit - 7 2015_05_29 Latham letter
Date: April 29, 2021Proposed Order Denying TRO
Date: April 29, 2021Exhibit - 5 2014_04_14 Letter
Date: April 29, 2021Rule 11 Agreement
Date: May 26, 2021DOCKET CONTROL ORDER-JCVO02
Date: May 26, 2021Notice of Accelerated Appeal
Date: June 04, 2021Notice of Fourteenth Court of Appeals
Date: June 14, 2021Notice of Fourteenth Court of Appeal
Date: June 07, 2021ORDER SGND GRANTING INSPECTIO NOF IN-CAMERA DOCUMENT
Date: June 25, 2021Exhibit_006 (RFP THREE RESPONSE)
Date: June 23, 2021Exhibit_005 (RFP TWO RESPONSE)
Date: June 23, 2021Exhibit_004 (RFP ONE RESPONSE)
Date: June 23, 2021Letter to the Court
Date: June 30, 2021(Proposed) Order-Denying
Date: May 19, 2021Proposed Order
Date: June 23, 2021Plaintiff's Original Petition for Declaratory Judgment
Date: August 12, 2015Motion for admission of Johanna Spellman pro hac vice
Date: November 06, 2015Proposed Judgment
Date: May 07, 2018ORDER GRANTING APPEARANCE PRO HAC VICE SIGNED
Date: November 10, 2015Civil Process Request Form
Date: August 19, 2015Motion for Admission on Mary Rose Alexander Pro Hac Vice
Date: November 12, 2015Notice of Subpoena
Date: January 27, 2016ORDER GRANTING APPEARANCE PRO HAC VICE SIGNED
Date: February 01, 2016Notice of Subpoena
Date: January 28, 2016Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Permit Withdrawal of Attorney
Date: February 08, 2016DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: October 08, 2015Plaintiff's Motion to Permit Withdrawal of Attorney
Date: February 08, 2016ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY SIGNED
Date: February 10, 2016Civil Process Request Form
Date: February 19, 2016Sworn Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Date: November 06, 2015Defendant Roger D. Parsons' Unopposed Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel
Date: February 19, 2016Proposed Defendant Roger D. Parsons' Unopposed Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel
Date: February 19, 2016Rule 11 Agreement
Date: March 24, 2016ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD
Date: March 30, 2016Letter to Judge McFarland - April 22,2016
Date: April 22, 2016ORDER GRANTING APPEARANCE PRO HAC VICE SIGNED
Date: May 05, 2016Rule 11 Agreement
Date: January 16, 2018Agreed Motion for Setting of Trial Date and Entry of New Docket Control Order
Date: February 27, 2018Notice of intent to dismiss-Bankruptcy
Date: February 21, 2018Proposed Docket Control Order
Date: February 27, 2018DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: March 07, 2018Letter
Date: April 30, 2021Sworn motion for admission ProHacVice
Date: January 14, 2016Proposed Order
Date: May 11, 2016Order (Proposed)
Date: June 02, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | {Proposed} Order | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Joint Nonsuit and Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | DCA Generic Letter | |
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER SIGNED REFUNDING CASH DEPOSIT | |
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Proposed Agreed Order Refunding Defendant Roger D. Parsons, In His Capacity as Trustee | |
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Ex. 1-Bond Receipt - 4.30.21 | |
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Breitburn Parties' 7th Amended Trial Exhibit List | |
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Exhibit 8 | |
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Exhibit 9 | |
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Exhibit 7 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.