Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Stewart, Darius, Villnave, Richard, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Anthony G Buzbee, against Encore Dredging Partners, Llc, Inland Dredging Company, Llc, represented by Thomas R. Nork, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts with Neves, Kerry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNeves, Kerry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 27, 2022 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Exhibit(s)
Date: June 28, 2023Copy of Notice
Date: June 08, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: June 29, 2023Order to Compel
Date: June 07, 2023Supplement
Date: June 28, 2023Notice of Intent
Date: June 23, 2023Correspondence from Court
Date: June 08, 2023Amended Counter Claim
Date: May 17, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: June 02, 2023Deputy Reporter Statement
Date: June 02, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: June 01, 2023Reply
Date: May 31, 2023Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: May 23, 2023Request for Hearing
Date: May 19, 2023Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: May 23, 2023Exhibit(s)
Date: May 16, 2023Opposition
Date: May 23, 2023Request for Hearing
Date: May 16, 2023Exhibit(s)
Date: May 16, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: May 16, 2023Exhibit(s)
Date: May 16, 2023Exhibit(s)
Date: May 16, 2023Exhibit(s)
Date: May 16, 2023Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: May 16, 2023Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: May 11, 2023Notice of Filing
Date: April 20, 2023Memorandum
Date: May 16, 2023Correspondence from Attorney
Date: May 11, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: May 12, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: May 09, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: May 09, 2023Notice of Intent
Date: March 23, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: March 16, 2023Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: March 17, 2023Docket Control Order
Date: March 03, 2023Order Granting Motion for Continuance
Date: March 03, 2023Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: March 02, 2023Order Denying Motion
Date: March 03, 2023Original Answer
Date: March 07, 2023Correspondence from Attorney
Date: March 02, 2023Copy of Notice
Date: March 03, 2023Response
Date: February 14, 2023Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: February 17, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: February 14, 2023Motion for Leave
Date: February 14, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: February 14, 2023Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: February 14, 2023Exhibit(s)
Date: February 14, 2023Exhibit(s)
Date: February 14, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: February 14, 2023Exhibit(s)
Date: February 14, 2023Exhibit(s)
Date: February 14, 2023Notice of Filing
Date: February 10, 2023Memorandum
Date: February 14, 2023Request for Hearing
Date: February 14, 2023Motion for Sanctions
Date: February 14, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: February 09, 2023Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: February 07, 2023Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: February 10, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: February 06, 2023Request for Hearing
Date: February 06, 2023Exhibit(s)
Date: February 06, 2023Exhibit(s)
Date: February 06, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: February 07, 2023Certificate
Date: February 01, 2023Exhibit(s)
Date: February 06, 2023Exhibit(s)
Date: February 06, 2023Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: February 06, 2023Notice of Filing
Date: January 20, 2023Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: January 10, 2023Certificate
Date: February 02, 2023Certificate
Date: February 01, 2023Memorandum
Date: February 06, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: January 05, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: January 05, 2023Rule 11 Agreement
Date: December 15, 2022Motion for Continuance
Date: January 05, 2023Counter Claim/Cross Action/Intervention/Third Party
Date: October 24, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: July 22, 2022Notice of Filing
Date: September 16, 2022Notice of Filing
Date: September 21, 2022Order
Date: August 19, 2022Correspondence from Attorney
Date: July 27, 2022Docket Control Order
Date: July 26, 2022Order on Pro Hac Vice
Date: July 13, 2022Correspondence from Court
Date: July 21, 2022Order on Pro Hac Vice
Date: July 13, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: July 08, 2022Amended Motion
Date: July 08, 2022Affidavit
Date: July 07, 2022Motion
Date: July 07, 2022Affidavit
Date: July 07, 2022Motion
Date: July 07, 2022Affidavit
Date: July 07, 2022Motion
Date: July 07, 2022Receipt Acknowledge
Date: July 07, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: July 07, 2022Motion
Date: July 07, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: July 07, 2022Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: July 07, 2022Affidavit
Date: July 07, 2022Motion for Leave
Date: July 06, 2022Original Answer
Date: July 06, 2022Exhibit(s)
Date: July 06, 2022Exhibit(s)
Date: July 06, 2022Exhibit(s)
Date: July 06, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: July 06, 2022Motion to Set Aside Judgment
Date: July 06, 2022Exhibit(s)
Date: July 06, 2022Memorandum
Date: July 06, 2022Amended Petition
Date: July 06, 2022Copy of Notice
Date: June 10, 2022Correspondence from Court
Date: July 06, 2022Correspondence from Attorney
Date: July 06, 2022Correspondence from Attorney
Date: June 07, 2022Request for Civil Service
Date: July 06, 2022Exhibit(s)
Date: June 02, 2022Copy of Notice
Date: June 07, 2022Default Judgment - Non Final (Interlocutory)
Date: June 06, 2022Exhibit(s)
Date: June 02, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: June 02, 2022Correspondence from Court
Date: May 05, 2022Motion for Default Judgment
Date: June 02, 2022Request for Hearing
Date: June 02, 2022Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: May 03, 2022Response
Date: September 14, 2023Reply
Date: September 20, 2023Reply
Date: September 15, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: September 13, 2023Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: September 21, 2023Certificate
Date: September 15, 2023Request for Hearing
Date: September 13, 2023Exhibit(s)
Date: September 08, 2023Exhibit(s)
Date: September 08, 2023Exhibit(s)
Date: September 08, 2023Exhibit(s)
Date: September 08, 2023Exhibit(s)
Date: September 08, 2023Exhibit(s)
Date: September 08, 2023Exhibit(s)
Date: September 08, 2023Certificate
Date: September 01, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: September 08, 2023Motion for Sanctions
Date: September 08, 2023Certificate
Date: September 01, 2023Certificate
Date: August 22, 2023Notice of Filing
Date: September 05, 2023Notice of Intent
Date: August 16, 2023Notice of Filing
Date: August 14, 2023Certificate
Date: September 01, 2023Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: August 11, 2023Notice of Filing
Date: July 21, 2023Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: August 07, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: July 13, 2023Notice of Intent
Date: August 09, 2023Copy of Notice
Date: July 17, 2023Notice of Filing
Date: July 12, 2023Motion to Withdraw
Date: July 13, 2023Order Granting Motion to Withdrawal Counsel
Date: July 14, 2023Response
Date: June 29, 2023Correspondence from Attorney
Date: July 11, 2023Copy of Notice
Date: July 11, 2023Correspondence from Court
Date: July 10, 2023Reply
Date: July 05, 2023Order Denying Summary Judgment
Date: July 07, 2023Receipt Acknowledge
Date: April 28, 2022Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: April 28, 2022Receipt Acknowledge
Date: April 28, 2022Status Conference Sheet
Date: April 28, 2022Request for Civil Service
Date: April 27, 2022Original Petition - OCA
Date: April 27, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Neves, Kerry) 03/27/2023 Continued to 09/11/2023 - Continuance Granted - Encore Dredging Partners, LLC; Stewart, Darius; Villnave, Richard 09/11/2023 Reset by Court to 10/09/2023 | |
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Submission (4:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Neves, Kerry) (WITHOUT ORAL HEARING) ON PLTFS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFTS (FILED 9/8/23). (WITHOUT ORAL HEARING) ON PLTFS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFTS (FILED 9/8/23). |
|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Neves, Kerry) IN-PERSON ATTENDANCE BY COUNSEL IS MANDATORY IN-PERSON ATTENDANCE BY COUNSEL IS MANDATORY |
|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice - From Court of Setting Date (Judicial Officer: Neves, Kerry ) notice the court has set pltf's motion for sanctions aganist deft's for submission on 10/05/2023@4:00PM notice the court has set pltf's motion for sanctions aganist deft's for submission on 10/05/2023@4:00PM |
|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Amended Notice of Submission on Request for Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions Notice of Hearing Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of Submission on its Motion for Sanctions Against Defendants Inland Dredging Company, LLC. and Encore Dredging Partners, LLC Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of Submission on its Motion for Sanctions Against Defendants Inland Dredging Company, LLC. and Encore Dredging Partners, LLC |
|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Notice of Submission on Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions Notice of Hearing Plaintiffs' Notice of Submission on its Motion for Sanctions Against Defts Inland Dredging Company, LLC and Encore Dredging Partners, LLC Plaintiffs' Notice of Submission on its Motion for Sanctions Against Defts Inland Dredging Company, LLC and Encore Dredging Partners, LLC |
|
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Defts' Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion for Discovery Sanctions Reply Defts' Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion for Discovery Sanctions |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plt Reply to Motion for Sanctions Reply Plaintiffs' Reply to Motion for Sanctions Against Defendants Inland Dredging Company, LLC. and Encore Dredging Partners, LLC Plaintiffs' Reply to Motion for Sanctions Against Defendants Inland Dredging Company, LLC. and Encore Dredging Partners, LLC |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
REPORTERS CERTIFICATION FOR THE DEPOSITION OF MARK RIDDLE Certificate REPORTERS CERTIFICATION FOR THE DEPOSITION OF MARK RIDDLE |
|
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Defendants' Response to Motion for Sanctions Response Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Discovery Sanctions Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Discovery Sanctions |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.