Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Welch, Jennifer, Welch, Robert, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Dax O. Faubus, Faubus, Dax O., against Blue Marlin Resources, L.L.C., Greeneco Builders, L.L.C., represented by Cohn, H.Miles, Melinda M. Riseden, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 122nd District Court with Ellisor, John presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 01, 2019 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House122nd District Court |
Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: July 15, 2020Copy of Notice
Date: December 30, 2022Order of Dismissal - Final - OCA
Date: December 29, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: December 28, 2022Attorney Vacation Letter
Date: September 16, 2022Motion to Dismiss
Date: December 28, 2022Order Resetting Hearing/Trial
Date: July 19, 2022Copy of Notice
Date: July 05, 2022Response
Date: June 07, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: June 07, 2022Order Denying
Date: June 29, 2022Report
Date: June 16, 2022Copy of Notice
Date: July 19, 2022Request for Hearing
Date: April 28, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: April 28, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: May 03, 2022Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: May 02, 2022Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: April 28, 2022Copy of Notice
Date: February 14, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: January 14, 2022Order Denying Motion
Date: February 09, 2022Docket Control Order
Date: March 10, 2022Response
Date: January 14, 2022Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: December 20, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: December 20, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: December 16, 2021Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: December 15, 2021Copy of Notice
Date: December 15, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: December 13, 2021Order Granting Summary Judgment - Non Final
Date: December 14, 2021Motion
Date: December 13, 2021Request for Hearing
Date: December 13, 2021Motion
Date: December 03, 2021Request for Hearing
Date: December 06, 2021Correspondence
Date: November 30, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: November 30, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: November 19, 2021Order Granting Motion for Continuance
Date: November 23, 2021Motion for Continuance
Date: November 19, 2021Reply
Date: November 08, 2021Correspondence
Date: November 19, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: November 18, 2021Response
Date: November 03, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: October 13, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: November 03, 2021Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: October 08, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: October 08, 2021Request for Hearing
Date: October 08, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: September 27, 2021Certificate
Date: September 23, 2021Plea to Court
Date: September 17, 2021Response
Date: September 27, 2021Amended Counter Claim
Date: September 17, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: May 17, 2021Motion
Date: May 17, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: May 14, 2021Docket Control Order
Date: February 12, 2021Copy of Notice
Date: January 12, 2021Order Granting Motion for Continuance
Date: January 06, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: December 31, 2020Motion for Continuance
Date: December 31, 2020Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: October 28, 2020Correspondence from Attorney
Date: November 12, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: October 29, 2020Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: October 09, 2020Motion
Date: October 07, 2020Request for Hearing
Date: October 09, 2020Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: October 07, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: October 09, 2020Response
Date: August 31, 2020Amended Counter Claim
Date: August 06, 2020Plea to Court
Date: August 19, 2020Amended Petition
Date: August 18, 2020Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: July 15, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: July 01, 2020Response
Date: July 15, 2020Motion
Date: June 22, 2020Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: June 29, 2020Docket Control Order
Date: February 03, 2020Request for Hearing
Date: June 23, 2020Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: June 22, 2020Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: January 30, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: December 05, 2019Answer
Date: February 03, 2020Copy of Notice
Date: June 24, 2019Order of Abatement
Date: June 21, 2019Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: June 20, 2019Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: June 19, 2019Correspondence from Court
Date: May 31, 2019Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: May 29, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: May 29, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: May 30, 2019Counter Claim
Date: April 08, 2019Request for Hearing
Date: May 24, 2019Response
Date: April 18, 2019Docket Control Order
Date: May 23, 2019Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: March 22, 2019Receipt Acknowledge
Date: March 06, 2019Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: March 06, 2019Status Conference Sheet
Date: March 04, 2019Receipt Acknowledge
Date: March 04, 2019OCA Case Information Sheet
Date: March 01, 2019Request for Civil Service
Date: March 01, 2019Original Petition - OCA
Date: March 01, 2019Response
Date: July 15, 2020Motion
Date: June 22, 2020Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: June 22, 2020Docket Control Order
Date: February 03, 2020Answer
Date: February 03, 2020Order of Abatement
Date: June 21, 2019Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: June 20, 2019Docket Control Order
Date: May 23, 2019Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: June 19, 2019Response
Date: April 18, 2019Counter Claim
Date: April 08, 2019Original Petition - OCA
Date: March 01, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Other CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Ellisor, John) Other ANNOUNCED SETTLED AT PTC 07/18/2022 Reset by Court to 08/15/2022 08/15/2022 Reset by Court to 10/10/2022 10/10/2022 Reset by Court to 11/07/2022 11/07/2022 Reset by Court to 01/02/2023 |
|
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal - Final - OCA (Judicial Officer: Ellisor, John ) | |
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes ORDER SIGNED ON AGREED DISMISSAL ORDER SIGNED ON AGREED DISMISSAL |
|
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
P. Order --Agreed Motion to Dismiss-Prop Order Proposed Order (unsigned) Agreed Motion to Dismiss. Agreed Motion to Dismiss. |
|
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Agreed Motion to Dismiss. Motion to Dismiss Agreed Motion to Dismiss. |
|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Ellisor, John) ANNOUNCED SETTLED AT PTC 07/11/2022 Reset by Court to 08/08/2022 08/08/2022 Reset by Court to 10/03/2022 10/03/2022 Reset by Court to 12/19/2022 ANNOUNCED SETTLED AT PTC |
|
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Attorney Vacation Schedule Request Attorney Vacation Letter Attorney Vacation Schedule Request |
|
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Resetting Hearing/Trial (Judicial Officer: Ellisor, John ) This case is reset for trial 10-10-22 @ 9:00 a.m. - PTC reset for 10-03-22 This case is reset for trial 10-10-22 @ 9:00 a.m. - PTC reset for 10-03-22 |
|
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.