Case Last Refreshed: 9 hours ago
Hasler, Jennifer, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Rachel Roland, against Mcentire, David, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 442nd Judicial District Court with Haertling, Tiffany presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2018 |
CategoryRegister Foreign Judgment |
Last RefreshedMay 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Filing Court House442nd Judicial District Court |
Motion
Date: May 22, 2020Abatement Order
Date: April 01, 2020Motion to Stay
Date: February 25, 2020Counter Petition/Claim
Date: February 25, 2020Motion to Reconsider
Date: February 21, 2020Civil Docket Summary
Date: February 18, 2020Order Of Transfer
Date: February 18, 2020Order
Date: February 18, 2020Request for Issuance of
Date: January 07, 2020Motion/Petition To Modify
Date: January 07, 2020Special Appearance
Date: January 23, 2020Order
Date: October 14, 2019Request for Issuance of
Date: November 26, 2019Order
Date: June 25, 2019Order
Date: July 05, 2019Foreign Judgment
Date: November 14, 2019Order
Date: September 11, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: June 25, 2019Filed document
Date: June 21, 2019Filed document
Date: June 17, 2019Filed document
Date: June 11, 2019Order
Date: March 08, 2019Motion
Date: March 08, 2019Filed document
Date: March 04, 2019Filed document
Date: May 14, 2019Amended Order
Date: March 22, 2019Response(s)
Date: February 26, 2019Order
Date: February 25, 2019Order
Date: March 13, 2019Response(s)
Date: February 22, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: February 25, 2019Response(s)
Date: September 05, 2018Amended
Date: February 22, 2019Email Correspondence from:
Date: August 13, 2018Filed document
Date: February 19, 2019Filed document
Date: February 12, 2019Filed document
Date: February 12, 2019Petitioner(s)
Date: February 11, 2019Filed document
Date: February 11, 2019Filed document
Date: November 27, 2018Respondent's
Date: February 08, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: February 04, 2019Respondent's
Date: February 11, 2019Order
Date: November 27, 2018Filed document
Date: January 29, 2019Memorandum
Date: January 07, 2019Order
Date: October 23, 2018Case Information Sheet
Date: August 10, 2018Petitioner(s)
Date: February 28, 2018Filed document
Date: November 27, 2018Order
Date: October 09, 2018Proposed
Date: October 03, 2018Order on Motion for Continuance
Date: September 28, 2018Response(s) and Objection(s)
Date: August 13, 2018Secretary of State Certification regarding citation
Date: August 16, 2018Invoice
Date: August 10, 2018Case Information Sheet
Date: August 10, 2018Petition
Date: August 10, 2018Proposed
Date: September 21, 2018Response(s) and Objection(s)
Date: September 13, 2018Secretary of State Certification regarding citation
Date: September 10, 2018Filed document
Date: September 10, 2018Order
Date: August 31, 2018Record/Copy Request
Date: March 09, 2020Order
Date: October 23, 2018Order
Date: September 28, 2018Order
Date: October 09, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | File sent to Records Management (storage) | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing Agreed Order Entered CANCELED Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Haertling, Tiffany) Agreed Order Entered set from DWOP by agreement of counsel via email on 04/01/22 |
|
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Docket Call Agreed Order Entered CANCELED Docket Call (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Haertling, Tiffany) Agreed Order Entered zoom docket call set from DWOP by agreement of counsel via email on 04/01/22 |
|
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: Armstrong, Rebecca Party: Else, Jennifer Party: Armstrong, RebeccaParty: Else, Jennifer |
|
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Haertling, Tiffany ) Agreed Order in Suit to Modify Parent-Child Relationship for Parties: Hasler, Jennifer for Parties: McEntire, David Agreed Order in Suit to Modify Parent-Child Relationship |
|
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Document(s) Agreement Agreement |
|
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Document(s) Agreement Agreement |
|
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Courts Dismissal Hearing Agreed Order Entered CANCELED Courts Dismissal Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Haertling, Tiffany) Agreed Order Entered |
|
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Written Discovery Party: McEntire, David Party: McEntire, David |
|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Order and Discovery Control Plan (Judicial Officer: Haertling, Tiffany ) Family Law Family Law |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.