Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Krisco, Melissia M., Miller, William Richard, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Michael S. Rumac, against Sword, Robert, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 393rd Judicial District Court with Robison, Douglas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobison, Douglas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 21, 2016 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
|
Filing Court House393rd Judicial District Court |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to:
Date: August 07, 2017Record/Copy Request
Date: August 31, 2018Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case)
Date: August 21, 2018Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case)
Date: August 17, 2018Motion for Entry
Date: August 14, 2018Record/Copy Request
Date: March 05, 2018First Amended (Original) Petition
Date: August 01, 2017Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case)
Date: August 07, 2017Motion for Continuance
Date: May 15, 2017Final Order/Judgment/Decree (partial case closing)
Date: August 02, 2017Order on Motion
Date: May 16, 2017Motion for Severance
Date: August 01, 2017Attorney Vacation or Out of Office Letter from:
Date: January 27, 2017Motion for Continuance
Date: March 06, 2017Order on Motion
Date: March 10, 2017Order on Motion
Date: November 29, 2016Motion
Date: November 28, 2016Request for Issuance of
Date: November 21, 2016Proposed Order (will not be signed)
Date: November 21, 2016Plaintiff's Original Petition
Date: November 21, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Record/Copy Request | |
August 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion For Entry Motion Granted CANCELED Motion For Entry (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Robison, Douglas) Motion Granted of Judgment Nunc Pro Tunc Pursuant to Texas Rule of Civil Procedure 316 (set by M. Rumac on 8-15-18) 30 MINUTES |
|
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Ray, Jerry D. ) Amended Judgment Nunc Pro Tunc Against Sword for Parties: Krisco, Melissia M. for Parties: Miller, William Richard for Parties: Sword, Robert Amended Judgment Nunc Pro Tunc Against Sword |
|
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Robison, Douglas ) Judgment Nunc Pro Tunc Against Robert Sword (see Amended Nunc Pro Tunc Order) for Parties: Krisco, Melissia M. for Parties: Miller, William Richard for Parties: Sword, Robert Judgment Nunc Pro Tunc Against Robert Sword (see Amended Nunc Pro Tunc Order) |
|
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
August 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Entry of Judgment of Nunc Pro Tunc Pursuant Texas Rule of Civil Procedure 316 Filed by: Krisco, Melissia M. Filed by: Miller, William Richard of Judgment of Nunc Pro Tunc Pursuant Texas Rule of Civil Procedure 316 |
|
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Record/Copy Request | |
October 03, 2017 | Docket Event | File sent to Records Management (storage) | |
August 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Non Jury Trial Case has been disposed CANCELED Non Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robison, Douglas) Case has been disposed 1 DAY - NUMBER 1 03/15/2017 Continued to 05/30/2017 - Continuance Granted - Krisco, Melissia M.; Miller, William Richard 05/30/2017 Continued to 08/14/2017 - Continuance Granted - Krisco, Melissia M.; Miller, William Richard |
|
August 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: Sword, Robert Party: Sword, Robert |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.