Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Geico County Mutual Insurance Company, Geico County Mutual Insurancecompany, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Lobes, Jessica R, against Carson, Kimberly Kay, Sharpe, Danny Wilson, represented by Teague, Mark Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 134th District Court with TILLERY, DALE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTILLERY, DALE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 03, 2023 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedMarch 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House134th District Court |
This complaint is a legal document filed by GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company against defendants Kimberly Kay Carson and Danny Wilson Sharpe in the Dallas District Court of the State of Texas. The plaintiff alleges that on or about December 17, 2...
MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: September 05, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 16, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 13, 2024Jury Trial - Civil
Date: March 11, 2024RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 30, 2024REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: May 03, 2023AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 05, 2024NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 09, 2024NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: July 27, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: February 26, 2024MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: January 09, 2024MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: February 26, 2024ORDER - JUDGMENT
Date: January 14, 2024ISSUE CITATION
Date: May 03, 2023ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 10, 2023ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: May 03, 2023Motion - New Trial
Date: March 07, 2024NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: May 22, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: February 26, 2024NOTE - CLERKS
Date: January 17, 2024SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: September 01, 2023PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: February 26, 2024DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: August 28, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 26, 2024NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: September 01, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: February 16, 2024JURY DEMAND
Date: August 10, 2023MOTION - NEW TRIAL
Date: February 13, 2024Motion - New Trial
Date: March 07, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
134th Trial Notice Letters Jury Trial - Civil |
|
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTOIN FOR NEW TRIAL Motion - New Trial SET BY APRIL 903-813-1900 - 30M - VIA TEAMS(hearing held, ruling issued) |
|
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
DEF MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL Motion - New Trial SET BY APRIL 903-813-1900 - 30M - VIA TEAMS |
|
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
KIMBERLY KAY CARSON WITNESS LIST WITNESS LIST KIMBERLY KAY CARSON |
|
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
KIMBERLY KAY CARSON MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION - IN LIMINE |
|
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
KIMBERLY KAY CARSON EXHIBIT LIST EXHIBIT LIST KIMBERLY KAY CARSON |
|
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
DEF PROPOSED JURY CHARGE PROPOSED JURY CHARGE DEFENDANTS |
|
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER ON KIMBERLY KAY CARSON MOTION IN LIMINE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED ORDER ON KIMBERLY KAY CARSON'S MOTION IN LIMINE |
|
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTOIN FOR NEW TRIAL NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT ON MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL |
|
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER FOR NEW TRIAL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.