Case Last Refreshed: 4 hours ago
Mitchell, Robert Wayne, filed a(n) Other (Civil) case represented by Warren, Taj Adarryl, against Tdc, Id, Bryan Collier, represented by Ninh, Jordan D., Suarez, Luis Armando, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 298th District Court with TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTOBOLOWSKY, EMILY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 06, 2023 |
CategoryOther (Civil) |
Last RefreshedApril 30, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House298th District Court |
CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: February 20, 2024MOTION - STAY
Date: February 20, 2024ORIGINAL ANSWER - DEFENDANT
Date: September 25, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 06, 2023AMENDED PETITION
Date: August 18, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 18, 2023MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: June 26, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: July 22, 2024NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 06, 2024MOTION HEARING
Date: February 29, 2024REQUEST CLERK PREPARE RECORD
Date: October 10, 2023REQUEST REPORTER RECORD
Date: October 10, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: March 04, 2024Temporary Injunction
Date: September 05, 2023RESPONSE
Date: September 08, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL - CT. OF APPEALS
Date: October 10, 2023APPELLATE RECORD
Date: October 12, 2023ORDER - TEMPORARY INJUNCTION
Date: September 26, 2023DEPUTY REPORTER STATEMENT
Date: August 21, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 03, 2023MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: August 03, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 03, 2023MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: August 30, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 31, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: July 31, 2023MOTION - JUDGMENT
Date: May 23, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 23, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 09, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: August 18, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 03, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 01, 2023ISSUE CITATION
Date: June 26, 2023NOTICE SENT VIA EMAIL/FAX
Date: June 16, 2023MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: June 09, 2023PLEA TO JURISDICTION
Date: February 12, 2024Non Jury Trial
Date: February 06, 2024RESPONSE
Date: September 07, 2023AMENDED PETITION
Date: August 18, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 07, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: August 18, 2023AMENDED PETITION
Date: August 18, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: July 31, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 31, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 31, 2023ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: April 06, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: February 23, 2024COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER
Date: October 11, 2023RESPONSE
Date: September 06, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 30, 2023ORDER - TEMPORARY RESTRAINING
Date: August 07, 2023MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: July 31, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 31, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: June 09, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: November 10, 2023RETURNED MAIL
Date: October 10, 2023ORDER - TEMPORARY RESTRAINING
Date: August 21, 2023RETURNED MAIL
Date: October 10, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 21, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
JURY TRIAL NOTICE - DO NOT USE Jury Trial - Civil |
|
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER FOR STAY AND PLEA TO JURISDICTION NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
JURY TRIAL NOTICE - DO NOT USE Jury Trial - Civil |
|
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
EMERGENCY MOTION FOR STAY OF TRIAL PROCEEDINGS PENDING DETERMINATION OF JURISDICTION MOTION HEARING **VIA ZOOM ** DEFT'S EMERG M/STAY & PLEA JURISIDICTION - JORDAN MININH 512 96-0808 |
|
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S PLEA TO JURISDICTION AND EMERGENCY MOTION FOR STAY NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT ON PLEA TO THE JURISDICTION AND MOTION TO STAY |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
(EMERGENCY) LETTER TO JUDGE REGARDING STAY AND PLEA TO JURISDICTION CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
EMERGENCY MOTION FOR STAY OF TRIAL PROCEEDINGS PENDING DETERMINATION OF JURISDICTION MOTION - STAY |
|
February 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
DEF'S PLEA TO JURISDICTION PLEA TO JURISDICTION |
|
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
NON JURY TRIAL NOTICE - DO NOT USE Non Jury Trial |
|
November 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - JORDAN D NIHN NOTICE OF APPEARANCE JORDAN D NIHN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.