Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Reyes Group, Ltd., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Hubbard, Curtis, against Elk Engineering Associates, Inc., represented by Buechler, Daniel P, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 101st District Court with WILLIAMS, STACI presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2021 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House101st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: December 06, 2021DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: February 25, 2022MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: February 11, 2022ISSUE CITATION
Date: December 06, 2021MOTION - DISMISS
Date: May 24, 2022MOTION - QUASH
Date: December 02, 2022THIRD PARTY ACTION
Date: December 01, 2022ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 20, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 28, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 11, 2022ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 14, 2022JURY DEMAND
Date: February 14, 2022Settlement Conference
Date: April 05, 2023MOTION - DISMISS
Date: May 02, 2023Motion - Default Judgment
Date: February 18, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 02, 2023AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 27, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 20, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: March 01, 2023RESPONSE
Date: November 04, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: March 01, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 01, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: January 20, 2023ORDER - DENY CONTINUANCE
Date: February 06, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: March 07, 2023MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: March 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTE - CLERKS | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS MOTION - DISMISS AGREED |
|
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER DISMISS NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT AGRED ORER 0F DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
101st Dismissal - Settled Settlement Conference |
|
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
101st J/NJ Trial Notice 2021 Jury Trial - Civil |
|
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT'S WITNESS LIST WITNESS LIST THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT'S |
|
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT'S EXHIBIT LIST EXHIBIT LIST THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT'S |
|
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER ON MOTION IN LIMINE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION - IN LIMINE THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT'S |
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
AMENDED ANSWER BK CORRISION AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL BK CORRISION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.