Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Dietz, Chad, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Hernandez, Rocio Gosewehr, against Bold Stroke Studios, Segura, Josue, Velazquez, Antonio, represented by Aleman, Sergio E, Wright, Ronald Paul, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 134th District Court with TILLERY, DALE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTILLERY, DALE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 26, 2020 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House134th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: May 29, 2020ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: May 26, 2020Non Jury Trial
Date: April 12, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: June 09, 2020AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: October 06, 2020MOTION - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: January 04, 2021ORDER - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: February 05, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: May 29, 2020ORDER - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: February 05, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: June 09, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: October 05, 2020AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 26, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 27, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 04, 2021NO EVIDENCE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: February 26, 2021Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: March 31, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: May 26, 2020MOTION - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: January 27, 2021Jury Trial - Civil
Date: April 12, 2021MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: February 23, 2021AMENDED PETITION
Date: August 21, 2020NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: June 09, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 26, 2020RESPONSE
Date: March 10, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 26, 2021RESPONSE
Date: March 26, 2021OBJECTION
Date: March 26, 2021EXHIBIT LIST
Date: March 29, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 26, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 26, 2021OBJECTION
Date: March 26, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: August 21, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 11, 2020JURY DEMAND
Date: January 26, 2021MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: May 18, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 31, 2021Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: March 31, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 12, 2021NOTE - CLERKS
Date: July 08, 2021MOTION - STRIKE
Date: March 30, 2021RESPONSE
Date: March 29, 2021Jury Trial - Civil
Date: July 13, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 31, 2021MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: March 31, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 31, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 02, 2021ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: April 01, 2021NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: April 01, 2021ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: April 01, 2021RESPONSE
Date: March 11, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 10, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 04, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 19, 2021MOTION - DISMISS
Date: July 06, 2021Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: June 16, 2021FINAL DISPOSITION HEARING
Date: June 10, 2021Final Disposition Hearing
Date: July 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
134th Disposition Fridays Setting Final Disposition Hearing |
|
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
134th Trial Notice Letters Jury Trial - Civil |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NONAPPEARANCE OF GOWRI BALACHANDAR, M.D. CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION GOWRI BALACHANDAR, M.D. |
|
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL ORDER MAILED TO ALL (3) NOTE - CLERKS |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS MOTION - DISMISS |
|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING RE: AMENDED MOTION FOR NO EVIDENCE SUMMARY JUDGMENT Motion - Summary Judgment *AMENDED *FILED 5-18-21 *30 MIN *SET BY SERGIO ALEMAN, 972-768-9527 |
|
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION HEARING NOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION HEARING |
|
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING RE: AMENDED MOTION FOR NO EVIDENCE SUMMARY JUDGMENT NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT RE: AMENDED MOTION FOR NO EVIDENCE SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANTS AMENDED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT AMENDED |
|
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED ATTORNEY ISSUED SUBPOENA - GOWRI BALACHANDAR, MD RETURN OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.