Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Pickett, David, filed a(n) Property case represented by Dees, Tom M, Iii, Fitch, Elizabeth A., Thomas, Stewart Hyer, against Hill, Al G, Iii, Hill, Erin Nance, represented by Clevenger, Ty, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 162nd District Court with MOORE, MARICELA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 21, 2016 |
CategoryProperty |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House162nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: April 21, 2016RESPONSE
Date: December 14, 2016MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: December 13, 2016MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: July 25, 2017MOTION - ENTER ORDER
Date: August 09, 2017NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 07, 2017CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 05, 2017RESPONSE
Date: September 11, 2017NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 15, 2016ORDER - MISC.
Date: September 19, 2017INTERVENTION
Date: August 10, 2016Final Disposition Hearing
Date: October 13, 2017MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: December 13, 2016NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 14, 2016REGISTRY DEPOSIT RECEIPT
Date: September 26, 2016REGISTRY DEPOSIT RECEIPT
Date: September 22, 2016CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: December 13, 2016NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 13, 2016NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: December 13, 2016CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 27, 2016ORDER - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: June 28, 2016NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 27, 2016INTERVENTION
Date: August 10, 2016RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2016RESPONSE
Date: December 14, 2016MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: January 19, 2017RESPONSE
Date: December 13, 2016NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 19, 2017NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: December 19, 2016ORDER - MISC.
Date: December 16, 2016MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: August 11, 2016CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS
Date: August 11, 2016RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2016CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 15, 2016AMENDED PETITION
Date: May 23, 2016ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: April 21, 2016NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 11, 2016NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: January 20, 2017MOTION - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: June 27, 2016CITATION ISSUED
Date: April 28, 2016CITATION ISSUED
Date: May 26, 2016REGISTRY DEPOSIT RECEIPT
Date: January 27, 2017ORDER - RECEIVER
Date: July 27, 2017NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 25, 2017CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE
Date: December 14, 2016ORDER - JUDGMENT
Date: August 12, 2016ORDER - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: September 12, 2016CITATION ISSUED
Date: August 17, 2016NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 15, 2016MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: August 07, 2017CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 07, 2017RETURNED MAIL
Date: June 23, 2017MOTION - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: September 08, 2016NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 15, 2016NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR
Date: September 22, 2016NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR
Date: August 31, 2017RETURNED MAIL
Date: August 29, 2017NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: July 27, 2017OBJECTION
Date: July 27, 2017CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 05, 2017MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: August 08, 2017CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 11, 2017MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: September 22, 2016DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: September 22, 2016NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 11, 2017REGISTRY DEPOSIT RECEIPT
Date: September 28, 2016ORDER - MISC.
Date: September 22, 2016MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: August 15, 2016DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: September 16, 2016MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: July 25, 2017NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 07, 2017REGISTRY DEPOSIT RECEIPT
Date: January 20, 2017RETURNED MAIL
Date: August 24, 2017RETURNED MAIL
Date: April 10, 2017CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 30, 2017TRUST RECEIPT
Date: October 09, 2017ORDER - MISC.
Date: January 23, 2017CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 31, 2017RESPONSE
Date: August 08, 2017ORDER - MISC.
Date: September 19, 2017NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 14, 2017MOTION - ENTER ORDER
Date: August 09, 2017RESPONSE
Date: September 11, 2017Final Disposition Hearing
Date: October 13, 2017NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 10, 2017NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 14, 2017CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 12, 2017NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 09, 2017RESPONSE
Date: September 14, 2017NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 19, 2017RESPONSE
Date: September 11, 2017NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 15, 2017ORDER - MISC.
Date: September 19, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
162nd Notice of Intent to Dismiss Final Disposition Hearing STATUS OF JUDGMENT |
|
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
162nd Notice of Intent to Dismiss Final Disposition Hearing STATUS OF JUDGMENT |
|
October 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
TRUST RECEIPT RELEASE OF BOND |
|
October 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
TRUST RECEIPT RELEASE OF BOND |
|
September 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER - MISC. ORDER GRANTING RECEIVER'S FINAL REPORT AND MOTION FOR TERMINATING RECEIVERSHIP |
|
September 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER - MISC. AMENDED ORDER GRANTING RECEIVER'S AGREED VERIFIED MOTION TO APPROVE SALE OF FURNITURE AND CONTENTS AND APPROVE DISTRIBUTION OF PROCEEDS |
|
September 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Amended Order Granting Rcvr's Agreed Motion to Approve Sale NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT AMENDED ORDER ON RCVR'S MOTION TO APPROVE |
|
September 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER - MISC. ORDER GRANTING RECEIVER'S FINAL REPORT AND MOTION FOR TERMINATING RECEIVERSHIP |
|
September 19, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED | |
September 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER - MISC. AMENDED ORDER GRANTING RECEIVER'S AGREED VERIFIED MOTION TO APPROVE SALE OF FURNITURE AND CONTENTS AND APPROVE DISTRIBUTION OF PROCEEDS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.