Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Darrell W Cook Pc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Cook, Darrell, against Leksan, Thomas J, represented by Hough, Angela, Tostrud, Daniel D, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 14th District Court with MOYE', ERIC presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOYE', ERIC Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2010 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedJuly 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House14th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORDER - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: May 20, 2011ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)
Date: December 31, 2010MOTION - PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: April 21, 2011SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: April 12, 2011ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 07, 2011CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: May 12, 2011MOTION - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: May 19, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Rel Jdgmt RELEASE OF JUDGMENT Release of Jdgmt |
|
July 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Ltr_Clerk 07-22-14 (Rel of Jdgmt) CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE Letter filing Release of Jdgmt |
|
January 03, 2012 | Docket Event | Non Jury Trial | |
June 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS MAILED COPY OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT TO ATTORNEYS OF RECORD |
|
June 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion - Partial Summary Judgment P/M/P/SJ; FILED 4/21/11; 30MIN |
|
May 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
05-20-2011 - Order - Withdraw Attorney - DC Civ M - DC1016833 - 641 - 4234638 ORDER - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY |
|
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
05-19-2011 - Motion - Withdraw Attorney CV - DC1016833 - 4230063 MOTION - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY SUBST COUNS AND N/CHANGE OF FIRM |
|
May 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
05-12-2011 - Correspondence - Letter to File CV - DC1016833 - 4264862 CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE RE: UNIFORM SCHED/O |
|
April 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
04-29-2011 - Notice of Hearing-Fiat CV - DC1016833 - 4019228 NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT |
|
April 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
04-21-2011 - Motion - Partial Summary Judgment CV - DC1016833 - 3937175 MOTION - PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.