Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Daniels, James Edward, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Dart Area Rapid Transit, Edgar, Jr., Jerry Lane, Fox, Jason, Loncar, Brian, Nationwide Insurance Company, (total of 5) See All represented by Chumbley, David L, Fox, Jason H, Hollins, Joycell, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 44th District Court with CORTEZ, CARLOS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCORTEZ, CARLOS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2009 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House44th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
MOTION - LEAVE
Date: May 21, 2010MOTION - DISMISS
Date: March 03, 2010MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: March 02, 2010PLEA TO JURISDICTION
Date: July 21, 2010PLEA TO JURISDICTION
Date: January 25, 2010ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 21, 2010ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 04, 2010ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)
Date: December 29, 2009ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 25, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2010 | Docket Event | Non Jury Trial | |
August 25, 2010 | Docket Event | Plea to Jurisdiction | |
August 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER - MISC. O/PLEA JURISDICTION - DART - COPY DEFT |
|
July 27, 2010 | Docket Event | MANDATE DISMISS | |
July 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
07-21-2010 - Plea to Jurisdiction CV - DC0917355 - 2417579 PLEA TO JURISDICTION DEFT |
|
July 20, 2010 | Docket Event | MANDATE DISMISS | |
June 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
Special Exceptions 30 MIN |
|
June 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER - SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS COPY DEFT - DART |
|
May 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
05-21-2010 - Motion - Leave CV - DC0917355 - 2432681 MOTION - LEAVE TO DESIGNATE RESPONSIBLE 3RD PARTY - NO CERT OF CONF |
|
May 20, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.