Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
State Of Ohio, filed a(n) 02-Apr-18 case represented by Kelly D Madzey, Thomas Brodbeck, against Chase Matthew Younger, represented by Kiriakos G Kordalis, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County. This case was filed in Montgomery County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 04, 2018 |
Category02-Apr-18 |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMontgomery County, OH |
|
ORDER OF APPEARANCE SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FOR 11/1/18 AT 2:00 P.M.
Date: October 02, 2018ENTRY AND ORDER / NO CHANGE ON BOND PREVIOUSLY SET
Date: June 29, 2018DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS FILED BY KIRIAKOS KORDALIS
Date: May 24, 2018REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY FILED BY KIRIAKOS KORDALIS
Date: May 24, 2018ORDER OF APPEARANCE SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON 2/21/19 AT 2:00 P.M.
Date: January 29, 2019NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FILED BY Karl Kordalis
Date: May 24, 2018NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY KIRIAKOS KORDALIS
Date: May 24, 2018ORDER TO APPEAR ON INDICTED CHARGES
Date: April 11, 2018NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF PUBLIC DEFENDER FILED BY Michael Dailey
Date: April 12, 2018SENTENCING MEMORANDUM (AMENDED) FILED BY KELLY MADZEY
Date: July 31, 2019MEMORANDUM REGARDING MERGER AND MANDATORY MINIMUMS FILED BY KELLY MADZEY
Date: March 12, 2019WARRANT ON INDICTMENT (FLAGGED)
Date: April 11, 2018ORDER OF APPEARANCE SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON 1/29/19 AT 8:30 A.M.
Date: January 25, 2019ORDER OF APPEARANCE SETTING PROBATION REPORT FOR 8/1/19 AT 2:00 P.M.
Date: June 19, 2019MOTION TO SUPPRESS STOP, SEARCH AND STATEMENTS FILED BY KIRIAKOS KORDALIS
Date: September 10, 2018ORDER OF APPEARANCE SETTING BRADY MATERIALS HEARING FOR 5/31/18 AT 2:00 P.M.
Date: May 25, 2018ORDER TO PROVIDE BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: May 25, 2018DECISION AND ENTRY FILED; REGARDING BRADY MATERIALS
Date: June 08, 2018MOTION FOR BRADY MATERIAL FILED BY KIRIAKOS KORDALIS
Date: May 24, 2018NOTICE SETTING APPEARANCE DATES .
Date: April 19, 2018ENTRY FILED SETTING BOND AT $200,000 C/S PLUS COR/EHDP AND RECALL WARRANT
Date: April 17, 2018SHERIFF COURT TRANSPORT FEE
Date: November 01, 2018SHERIFF COURT TRANSPORT FEE
Date: November 29, 2018SHERIFF COURT TRANSPORT FEE
Date: February 21, 2019SHERIFF COURT TRANSPORT FEE
Date: February 28, 2019SENTENCING MEMORANDUM FILED BY KIRIAKOS KORDALIS
Date: July 30, 2019ORDER OF APPEARANCE SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FOR 03/21/2019
Date: March 01, 2019TIME WAIVER FILED
Date: June 13, 2018SHERIFF COURT TRANSPORT FEE
Date: March 22, 2019ORDER OF APPEARANCE FOR MOTION TO SUPPRESS ON 10/02/18
Date: August 31, 2018ORDER OF APPEARANCE FOR TRIAL ON 06/24/19
Date: March 25, 2019ENTRY OF WAIVER AND PLEA FINAL DISPO-DATE 8/1/19
Date: June 19, 2019MOTION AND ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE GRANTED TO 11/1/18
Date: October 05, 2018SHERIFF COURT TRANSPORT FEE
Date: November 09, 2018SHERIFF COURT TRANSPORT FEE
Date: August 02, 2019ORDER OF APPEARANCE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE 11/29/18
Date: November 09, 2018ORDER OF APPEARANCE SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FOR 06/07/2018
Date: May 25, 2018ORDER OF APPEARANCE SETTING MOTION TO SUPPRESS FOR 01/25/2019
Date: November 30, 2018SHERIFF COURT TRANSPORT FEE
Date: June 11, 2018MOTION AND ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE GRANTED TO 5/24/18
Date: May 04, 2018SHERIFF COURT TRANSPORT FEE
Date: May 04, 2018ORDER OF APPEARANCE FOR SCHEDULING CONFERNCE 5/24/18
Date: May 04, 2018ORDER OF APPEARANCE SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FOR 2/28/2019
Date: February 22, 2019MOTION AND ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE GRANTED TO 2/28/19
Date: February 22, 2019MOTION AND ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE GRANTED TO 3/21/19
Date: March 01, 2019ORDER TO WITHDRAW MOTION TO SUPPRESS
Date: March 22, 2019ORDER OF APPEARANCE FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE 7/19/18
Date: June 29, 2018SHERIFF COURT TRANSPORT FEE
Date: July 19, 2018SHERIFF COURT TRANSPORT FEE
Date: May 25, 2018ORDER OF APPEARANCE FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON 08/09/18
Date: July 20, 2018RETURN OF INDICTMENT SERVED 4/12/2018
Date: April 12, 2018MOTION AND ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE GRANTED TO 8/9/18
Date: July 20, 2018MOTION AND ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE RESET FROM 5/24/2018 TO 6/7/2018
Date: May 25, 2018ORDER OF APPEARANCE SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FOR 08/30/2018
Date: August 10, 2018ORDER OF APPEARANCE FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON 06/21/18
Date: June 08, 2018SHERIFF VIDEO TRANSPORT FEE
Date: April 17, 2018MOTION AND ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE GRANTED TO 8/30/18
Date: August 10, 2018MOTION AND ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE RESET FROM 6/7/18 TO 6/21/18
Date: June 08, 2018SHERIFF COURT TRANSPORT FEE
Date: August 31, 2018ENTRY FILED; DEFENDANT STOOD MUTE, COURT ENTERED PLEA OF NOT GUILTY
Date: April 19, 2018ORDER OF APPEARANCE SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FOR 6/28/2018
Date: June 22, 2018MOTION AND ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE GRANTED TO 6/28/18
Date: June 22, 2018MOTION AND ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE GRANTED TO 7/19/18
Date: June 28, 2018ORDER OF APPEARANCE SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FOR 11/08/18
Date: November 02, 2018MOTION AND ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE GRANTED TO 11/29/18
Date: November 09, 2018MOTION AND ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE RESET FROM 11/01/18 TO 11/08/18
Date: November 02, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event | TERMINATION ENTRY FILED; SENTENCED TO CRC FOR CT1: 3 YEARS PLUS 3 YEARS ON FIREARM SPECIFICATION PLUS 5 YEARS ON DISCHARGE OF FIREARM SPEC; CT2: 3 YEARS; CT3: 36 MONTHS; CTS 2 AND 3 SERVED CONCURRENT TO CT1; FIREARM SPEC ON CTS 2 AND 3 SERVED CONCURRENT TO SPEC ON CT1 FOR A TOTAL OF 11 YEARS. CTS 4 AND 5 GRANTED COMMUNITY CONTROL AND TO BE IMMEDIATELY TERMINATED AS OF 8/5/19. COSTS WAIVED | |
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event | WARRANT TO CONVEY PACKAGED AND DELIVERED TO SHERIFF CRIMINAL - WARRANT TO CONVEY RETURN Sent on: 08/09/2019 14:48:16.22 | |
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event | TERMINATION ENTRY FILED; COMMUNITY CONTROL GRANTED UP TO 5 YEARS CCS SHALL BE TERMINATED AS UNSUCCESSFUL IMMEDIATELY. DRIVERS LICENSE SUSPENDED FOR A TER OF 3 YEARS AND COURT COSTS WAIVED | |
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event | SHERIFF COURT TRANSPORT FEE | |
July 31, 2019 | Docket Event | SENTENCING MEMORANDUM (AMENDED) FILED BY KELLY MADZEY | |
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event | SENTENCING MEMORANDUM FILED BY KIRIAKOS KORDALIS | |
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event | DAYTON POLICE DEPARTMENT WITNESS FEE | |
June 19, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER OF APPEARANCE SETTING PROBATION REPORT FOR 8/1/19 AT 2:00 P.M. | |
June 19, 2019 | Docket Event | ENTRY OF WAIVER AND PLEA FINAL DISPO-DATE 8/1/19 | |
June 19, 2019 | Docket Event | REPARATION FEE AND ADDITIONAL COST FOR INDIGENT SUPPORT FUND - FELONY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.