Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Other Civil case in the jurisdiction of Franklin County. This case was filed in Franklin County Superior Courts with JEFFREY M BROWN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2017 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFranklin County, OH |
|
MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:02/27/17
Date: March 16, 2017REPLY TO
Date: April 21, 2017MEMO IN OPPOSITIONTO DFNDTS MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: April 14, 2017MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:04/03/17
Date: July 20, 2017AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: March 20, 2017MOTION IS MOOTTIE FILING DATE:02/27/17
Date: March 16, 2017ORDER
Date: February 09, 2018MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:04/12/18
Date: April 27, 2018AMENDED CASE SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: January 04, 2018MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:12/13/17
Date: January 04, 2018MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:11/29/17
Date: December 04, 2017MOTION DENIEDTIE FILING DATE:07/26/17
Date: February 09, 2018MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:08/02/17
Date: February 09, 2018DISMISS CERTAIN COUNTS OF COMPLAINT
Date: July 20, 2017MEMO IN OPPOSITIONTO MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT
Date: March 06, 2017COMPLAINT FILED
Date: January 30, 2017EXHIBITS
Date: July 20, 2021ENTRY
Date: July 16, 2021MOTION DENIEDTIE FILING DATE:07/13/18
Date: August 12, 2021AMENDED CASE SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: February 14, 2023MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:07/09/18
Date: July 16, 2021NOTICE RETURNED - NOT SERVED
Date: March 08, 2022ENTRY
Date: September 05, 2018NOTICE RETURNED - NOT SERVED
Date: May 09, 2022DISMISS CERTAIN COUNTS OF COMPLAINT
Date: August 02, 2021MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:12/29/21
Date: January 25, 2022NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: February 08, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: June 13, 2022EXHIBITS
Date: July 20, 2018MOTION RELEASED TO CLEAR DOCKETTIE FILING DATE:07/13/18
Date: July 16, 2021ENTRY
Date: August 12, 2021ENTRY
Date: March 15, 2023MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:02/24/22
Date: March 15, 2023MEMO IN OPPOSITION
Date: July 20, 2018AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: July 20, 2021JURY DEMAND - DEFENDANT
Date: August 02, 2021EXHIBITS
Date: July 13, 2018BRIEF IN OPPOSITION
Date: July 20, 2018NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: January 25, 2022NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: July 01, 2021MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:06/28/18
Date: September 05, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL COPY OF HEARING NOTICE FILEDDATE - COURTROOM:12/12/23TIME - COURTROOM:02:30 PMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 4A345 SOUTH HIGH STREET4TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215HEARING TYPE DESC:FINAL PRE-TRIALPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:DATTORNEY NAME:THERESA A EDWARDSATTORNEY ADDRESS:LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD &SUITE 22501375 E 9TH STCLEVELAND, OH 44114(216) 344-9422NOTICE PRINT DATE:10/13/23NOTICE MAIL DATE:10/13/23 | |
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL COPY OF HEARING NOTICE FILEDDATE - COURTROOM:12/12/23TIME - COURTROOM:02:30 PMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 4A345 SOUTH HIGH STREET4TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215HEARING TYPE DESC:FINAL PRE-TRIALPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:DATTORNEY NAME:BRADLEY J BARMENATTORNEY ADDRESS:1375 EAST 9TH STREETSUITE 1600CLEVELAND, OH 44114(216) 344-9422NOTICE PRINT DATE:10/13/23NOTICE MAIL DATE:10/13/23 | |
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL COPY OF HEARING NOTICE FILEDDATE - COURTROOM:12/12/23TIME - COURTROOM:02:30 PMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 4A345 SOUTH HIGH STREET4TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215HEARING TYPE DESC:FINAL PRE-TRIALPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PATTORNEY NAME:DAVID M RICKERTATTORNEY ADDRESS:DUNLEVEY MAHAN FURRY LPA SUITE 1000110 NORTH MAIN STREETDAYTON, OH 45402-1738(937) 223-6003NOTICE PRINT DATE:10/13/23NOTICE MAIL DATE:10/13/23 | |
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event | ENTRY | |
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:02/24/22 | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | STRIKE SCHEDULE DATETIE FILING DATE:06/13/22DATE - COURTROOM:03/27/23TIME - COURTROOM:10:30 AMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 4A345 SOUTH HIGH STREET4TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215 | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | STRIKE SCHEDULE DATETIE FILING DATE:06/13/22DATE - COURTROOM:02/23/23TIME - COURTROOM:10:00 AMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 4A345 SOUTH HIGH STREET4TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215 | |
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED CASE SCHEDULING ORDER | |
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | HEARING/EVENT SCHEDULEDDATE - COURTROOM:12/12/23TIME - COURTROOM:02:30 PMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 4A345 SOUTH HIGH STREET4TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215HEARING TYPE DESC:FINAL PRE-TRIALNOTICE REQ IND:YNOTC RET ADDR DSC:CLERK OF COURT OF COMMON PLEAS - CIVIL DIVISION NOTICE PRINT DATE:10/13/23NOTICE MAIL DATE:10/13/23 | |
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | HEARING/EVENT SCHEDULEDDATE - COURTROOM:01/16/24TIME - COURTROOM:10:30 AMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 4A345 SOUTH HIGH STREET4TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215HEARING TYPE DESC:TRIALNOTICE REQ IND:YNOTC RET ADDR DSC:CLERK OF COURT OF COMMON PLEAS - CIVIL DIVISION NOTICE MAIL DATE:11/17/23 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.