Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Franklin County. This case was filed in Franklin County Superior Courts with Carl A. Aveni, II presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 19, 2011 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFranklin County, OH |
|
MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:08/22/11
Date: September 15, 2011CASE REINSTATED BY ORDER
Date: December 01, 2011NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED
Date: August 19, 2011MEMO IN OPPOSITIONTO MOTION FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL
Date: August 29, 2011APPEALS DECISION COURT OF APPEALS
Date: August 16, 2012MOTION RELEASED TO CLEAR DOCKETTIE FILING DATE:10/14/11
Date: February 28, 2012ORDERENTRY AND ORDER GRANTING JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF APPELLANT
Date: October 26, 2011MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:09/27/11
Date: October 26, 2011NOTICE OF FINAL APPEALABLE ORDERNOTICE PRINT DATE:11/02/11NOTICE MAIL DATE:10/26/11
Date: October 26, 2011MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:10/26/11
Date: December 07, 2011MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:10/26/11
Date: December 01, 2011RECORD TRANSMITTED TO COURT OF APPEALSCRT OF APPEALS NO:11AP-1126
Date: January 10, 2012JUDGMENT REVERSED AND REMANDED - COURT OF APPEALSCRT OF APPEALS NO:11AP1126
Date: August 16, 2012NOTICE OF FINAL APPEALABLE ORDERNOTICE PRINT DATE:08/21/12NOTICE MAIL DATE:08/21/12
Date: August 21, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | MASS TRANFER OF JUDGE LOCATIONOLD COURTROOM:COURTROOM 3FNEW COURTROOM:COURTROOM 6A | |
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event | MASS TRANFER OF JUDGE LOCATIONOLD COURTROOM:COURTROOM 7BNEW COURTROOM:COURTROOM 3F | |
December 17, 2012 | Docket Event | APPLIED - CLERKAMOUNT - DEPOSIT:38.00HOW PAID IND:CHECK/MONEY ORDERINTRST BEARNG IND:NRECEIPT NUMBER:5686091PLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:DNAME:OHIO STATE BUREAU WORKERS COMPENSATION | |
December 17, 2012 | Docket Event | SECURITY DEPOSIT RECEIVEDAMOUNT - PAID:38.00HOW PAID IND:CHECK/MONEY ORDERRECEIPT NUMBER:5686091PLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:DNAME:OHIO STATE BUREAU WORKERS COMPENSATIONDfndt paid 38.00; includes late fee | |
December 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Dfndt paid 38.00; includes late fee | |
November 15, 2012 | Docket Event | 2ND NOTICE COST DUEMAILED TO OHIO BUREAU WORKERS COMPENSATION | |
October 09, 2012 | Docket Event | 1ST REMINDER NOTICEMAILED TO OHIO BUREAU WORKERS COMPENSATION | |
September 06, 2012 | Docket Event | MISCELLANEOUS PAPERRETURN RECEIPT FOR TRIAL COURT FILES | |
September 06, 2012 | Docket Event | RECORD DIVISION SIGNOUT FORM - IN1 FILE 1 RECORD OF PROCEEDING TO RECORDS ON 090612 | |
September 05, 2012 | Docket Event | COST BILL SENTAMOUNT:8.00CB MAILED DFNDT OH BUREAU WORKERS COMPENSATION PER TERM ENTRY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.