We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Temple Heights Llc Vs. Atomic Investments, Inc.

Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago

Temple Heights, Llc, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Campbell, John B, against Atomic Investments, Inc., Muirlands Investments, Llc, represented by Duque, Joseph A, Lahiri, Ranjan A, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Earl H. Maas, III presiding.

Case Details for Temple Heights, Llc v. Atomic Investments, Inc. , et al.

Judge

Earl H. Maas, III Track Judge’s New Cases

Filing Date

December 31, 2019

Category

Civil - Unlimited

Last Refreshed

September 14, 2023

Practice Area

Torts

Filing Location

San Diego County, CA

Matter Type

General Torts

Filing Court House

Superior

Parties for Temple Heights, Llc v. Atomic Investments, Inc. , et al.

Plaintiffs

Temple Heights, Llc

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Campbell, John B

Defendants

Atomic Investments, Inc.

Muirlands Investments, Llc

Attorneys for Defendants

Duque, Joseph A

Lahiri, Ranjan A

Case Documents for Temple Heights, Llc v. Atomic Investments, Inc. , et al.

Case initiation form printed.

Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00

Case Events for Temple Heights, Llc v. Atomic Investments, Inc. , et al.

Type Description
Docket Event Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (Judgment/Dismissal)
Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Temple Heights, LLC. Refers to: Atomic Investments, Inc.; Muirlands Investments, LLC
Docket Event Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Atomic Investments, Inc..
Docket Event Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Muirlands Investments, LLC.
Docket Event Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Temple Heights, LLC.
Docket Event Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Requests)
Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Joint Notice of Settlement and Stipulation for the Court to Retain Jurisdiction/664.6; Order) filed by Atomic Investments, Inc.; Muirlands Investments, LLC.
Docket Event Stipulation - Other (Requests)
Stipulation - Other (Joint Stipulation RE Modification to the Terms of Settlement Stipulation) filed by Atomic Investments, Inc.; Muirlands Investments, LLC.
Docket Event Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Requests)
Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Joint Stipulation to Continue Trial and All Related Trial Dates: Order) filed by Atomic Investments, Inc.; Muirlands Investments, LLC.
Docket Event Civil Jury Trial scheduled for 04/07/2023 at 09:15:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas was vacated.
Docket Event Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 03/10/2023 at 09:15:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas was vacated.
Docket Event Civil Jury Trial scheduled for 04/07/2023 at 09:15:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.
See all events