Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Ann Marie Papa, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Buonamici, A. Albert, against Antonio Larocca, represented by Varachi, John P, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts with Rolf Thorsen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRolf Thorsen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 28, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedJanuary 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - C *Corrected*
Date: October 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A2
Date: October 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A1
Date: October 31, 2023ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: December 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: October 31, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 31, 2023ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: October 11, 2023ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: October 11, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 28, 2023ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: June 07, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: May 16, 2023ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: May 25, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: June 05, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: May 16, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 07, 2023ANSWER
Date: May 05, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: June 01, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 04, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 31, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2023 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
October 31, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C *Corrected* RESPONSE TO DEMAND |
||
October 31, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A2 RESPONSE TO DEMAND |
||
October 31, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A1 RESPONSE TO DEMAND |
||
October 31, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D RESPONSE TO DEMAND |
||
October 31, 2023 | RESPONSE TO DEMAND | ||
October 31, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B RESPONSE TO DEMAND |
||
October 11, 2023 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
October 11, 2023 | ORDER - REFERENCE | ||
August 04, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Documents |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.