Case Last Refreshed: 2 days ago
Chris Fortner, Evelyn O'Brien, Heather Martin, Jaime Patchett, Jessica Taylor-Mackrodt, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) Special Proceedings - Other (Nyll 196-D) case represented by Chaudhuri, Ananda Narayan, Fleischman, Keith M, against Ocean Properies Ltd, Patrick Walsh, Portsmouth Corporate Financial Services Inc, Sagbolt Llc, Tom Guay, (total of 5) See All represented by Slocum, Michael James, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, NY, . Warren County, NY Superior Courts Supreme with Martin D. Auffredou presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMartin D. Auffredou Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 13, 2018 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Nyll 196-D) |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationWarren County, NY |
|
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #10)
Date: August 20, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #10)
Date: August 20, 2021NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #10)
Date: August 20, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #8)
Date: August 19, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: August 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - W Â (Motion #9)
Date: July 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #9)
Date: July 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #9)
Date: July 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #9)
Date: July 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #9)
Date: July 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #9)
Date: July 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #9)
Date: July 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #9)
Date: July 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #9)
Date: July 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #9)
Date: July 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #9)
Date: July 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #9)
Date: July 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #9)
Date: July 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #9)
Date: July 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #9)
Date: July 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #9)
Date: July 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #9)
Date: July 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #9)
Date: July 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #9)
Date: July 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #9)
Date: July 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #9)
Date: July 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #9)
Date: July 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #9)
Date: July 30, 2021AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #9)
Date: July 30, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #9)
Date: July 30, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #9)
Date: July 30, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 10, 2021AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 10, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 15, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 15, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 15, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED Â (Motion #8)
Date: December 10, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #8)
Date: December 04, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #8)
Date: December 04, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #8)
Date: December 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - TT Â (Motion #8)
Date: December 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - SS Â (Motion #8)
Date: December 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #8) Exhibit to Chaudhuri Affirmation - Exs. I through RR - Redacted
Date: December 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #8)
Date: December 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #8)
Date: December 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #8)
Date: December 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #8)
Date: December 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #8)
Date: December 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #8)
Date: December 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #8)
Date: December 04, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: December 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #8)
Date: December 04, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #14)
Date: March 25, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #8)
Date: December 04, 2020NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: December 04, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #8)
Date: December 04, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #15)
Date: April 12, 2024CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: April 13, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #14)
Date: December 03, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #14)
Date: December 03, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #14)
Date: April 08, 2024COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: April 13, 2018NOTICE OF APPEAL Â (Motion #14)
Date: April 12, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #15)
Date: April 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #14)
Date: December 03, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #14)
Date: December 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #14)
Date: December 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #14)
Date: November 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #14)
Date: September 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #14)
Date: November 03, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #14)
Date: November 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #14)
Date: September 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #14)
Date: September 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #14)
Date: September 20, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #14)
Date: September 20, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #14)
Date: September 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #14)
Date: September 20, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #14)
Date: September 20, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: May 25, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #13)
Date: January 05, 2023ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #13)
Date: January 20, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #13)
Date: January 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #13)
Date: January 05, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #13)
Date: January 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #13)
Date: January 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #13)
Date: January 05, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #13)
Date: January 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #13)
Date: January 05, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #13)
Date: January 05, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #13)
Date: January 05, 2023ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #12)
Date: August 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #12)
Date: August 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #12)
Date: August 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #12)
Date: August 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #12)
Date: August 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #12)
Date: August 17, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #12)
Date: August 17, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #12)
Date: August 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #9)
Date: December 20, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #12)
Date: August 17, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #11)
Date: June 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #9)
Date: December 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #9)
Date: December 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #9)
Date: December 20, 2021AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #9)
Date: December 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #9)
Date: December 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #9)
Date: December 20, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #9)
Date: December 20, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED Â (Motion #11)
Date: December 09, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #11)
Date: November 29, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #11)
Date: November 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #11)
Date: November 29, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #10)
Date: August 20, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #10)
Date: August 20, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #11)
Date: November 29, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #10)
Date: August 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #10)
Date: August 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #10)
Date: August 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #10)
Date: August 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #10)
Date: August 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2024 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #15) | ||
April 12, 2024 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #15) Notice of Motion to Stay Enforcement Pending Appeal of the Court's Order dated 3/22/2024 |
||
April 12, 2024 |
NOTICE OF APPEAL (Motion #14) Notice of Appeal and supporting papers |
||
April 12, 2024 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #15) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Stay Enforcement Pending Appeal of the Court's Order dated 3/22/2024 |
||
April 08, 2024 | NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #14) | ||
March 25, 2024 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #14) | ||
December 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #14) Ex. A (Luis Settlement Agreement) |
||
December 03, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #14) Chaudhuri Affirmation |
||
December 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #14) Ex. C (Robinson Settlement Agreement) |
||
December 03, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #14) Reply Memorandum of Law |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.