Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Christine Barksdale, filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Sussman, Michael H, against Attorney General, State Of New York, City Of Ithaca, State Of New York Division Of Criminal Justice Services, represented by Mcguinness, Terrance Michael, Redding, Earl Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts with Mark G Masler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark G Masler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2023 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 78 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
DECISION/ORDER + JUDGMENT
Date: November 15, 2023INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT
Date: December 21, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: November 28, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: November 21, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: September 21, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 27, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: January 27, 2023PETITION
Date: January 27, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: January 27, 2023NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: January 27, 2023ASSIGNED RJI
Date: January 30, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 03, 2023MOTION (UPDATED RETURN DATE)
Date: February 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 09, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: February 22, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Exhibit to the Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: March 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: March 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: March 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: March 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 16, 2023ANSWER
Date: March 16, 2023ANSWER
Date: March 17, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 17, 2023ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING
Date: September 18, 2023NOTICE OF PETITION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 11, 2023NOTICE OF PETITION (AMENDED)
Date: August 11, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: July 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 11, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 25, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: August 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2023 | INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT | ||
November 28, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | ||
November 21, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
November 15, 2023 | DECISION/ORDER + JUDGMENT | ||
September 21, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
September 18, 2023 | ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING | ||
September 18, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Agency Affidavit and supporting exhibits |
||
August 28, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
August 25, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
August 11, 2023 |
NOTICE OF PETITION (AMENDED) (Motion #1) Amended Verified Petition/Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.