Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
U.S. Bank National Association, Not In Its Individual Capacity But Solely As Trustee For Rmtp Trust, Series 2021 Bkm-Tt, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Friedman Vartolo, Llp, Vartolo, Ralph Lawrence, against Ashley E. Shannon, Eric M. Shannon, John Doe And Jane Doe, Technology Insurance Company, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Tioga County, NY, . Tioga County, NY Superior Courts with Cheryl Insinga presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 21, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationTioga County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM
Date: November 08, 2023NOTICE OF MORTGAGE SERVICER CHANGE
Date: November 22, 2023NOTICE RETURNED (UNDELIVERABLE)
Date: September 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Assignments of Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 21, 2023NOTICE TO DEFENDANT (PER AO-131-20)
Date: June 21, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: June 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: June 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Notice of Default Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 21, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: June 21, 2023CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: June 21, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 21, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1) Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 11, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1) Assignments of Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 11, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1) 1306 Proof of Filing Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1) Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1) Department of Defense Search Results Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #1) Affidavit in Support of Order of Reference Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1) 90 Day Foreclosure Notice Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1) Notice of Default Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 11, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 10, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 11, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 11, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 11, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1) *Corrected*
Date: September 11, 2023ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: September 11, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: September 12, 2023ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: September 12, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 22, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MORTGAGE SERVICER CHANGE NOTICE OF SERVICER CHANGE PURSUANT TO PART 202 UNIFORM CIVIL RULES 202.12-a(b)(1) |
||
November 22, 2023 | Affidavit of Mailing Notice of Mortgage Servicer Change | ||
November 08, 2023 | FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM | ||
September 19, 2023 |
NOTICE RETURNED (UNDELIVERABLE) Notice of FSC Undeliverable |
||
September 12, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
September 12, 2023 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
September 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Certificate of Merit |
||
September 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR Summons and Complaint Redacted |
||
September 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR Mortgage Redacted |
||
September 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #1) Affidavits of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.