Case Last Refreshed: 23 hours ago
Chuangxia Cai, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Gottheim, Jordan Edward, Li, Weiyu, Weiner, Jesse Jules, against Does 1-50, Xiao He Liu, represented by Li, Ge, Tung, Kevin Kerveng, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts Supreme with Maureen Liccione presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaureen Liccione Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: April 18, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #005)
Date: April 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #005)
Date: April 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: April 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #005)
Date: April 12, 2024AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #005)
Date: April 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #005)
Date: April 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #005)
Date: April 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: April 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #005)
Date: April 12, 2024AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #005)
Date: April 12, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: April 12, 2024NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: February 26, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 19, 2024NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 12, 2024NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: February 07, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 05, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 06, 2024DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 06, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 14, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 18, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 17, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 18, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 18, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 18, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 18, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 18, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 29, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 16, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 03, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 03, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 15, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 03, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 15, 2022ANSWER
Date: January 17, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: December 17, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 15, 2022NOTICE OF PENDENCY (01 LOT) *Corrected*
Date: December 20, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: December 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: December 17, 2021COMPLAINT *Corrected*
Date: December 17, 2021SUMMONS
Date: December 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2024 | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING | ||
April 12, 2024 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #005) | ||
April 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #005) Forensic Report of Cina Wong |
||
April 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #005) CV of Cina Wong |
||
April 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #005) Purported 2019 Amendment to Operating Agreement |
||
April 12, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #005) Affirmation of Cina Wong |
||
April 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #005) Excerpt from 2018 Tax Return |
||
April 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #005) Operating Agreement |
||
April 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #005) NYS Department of State Entity Information |
||
April 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #005) Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.