Case Last Refreshed: 10 hours ago
Lois T. Conforti Individually And As Personal Representative Of The Estate Of Anthony T. Conforti, Deceased, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Pinks, Steven Gerald, White, Teresa A., against John One Through John One Hundred They Being The Tenants, Occupants Or Parties Having A Mortgage, Judgment, Lien, Warrant Or Other Encumbrance Affecting The Premises, New York State Department Of Taxation And Finance, Sandy Hills, Llc, The Gross Family Holdings, Llc, The Wheatley Harbor, Llc, (total of 6) See All represented by Carlinsky, Mitchell J, Love, Adam N, Schultz, Kevin Edward, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts Supreme with J-Comm Hudson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJ-Comm Hudson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 08, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Commercial |
Last RefreshedApril 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This complaint is an action to foreclose a commercial mortgage. The plaintiff, Lois T. Conforti, is filing the complaint both individually and as the personal representative of the Estate of Anthony T. Conforti, who is deceased. The defendants in thi...
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 23, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 07, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 16, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 16, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 16, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 16, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 16, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 16, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 16, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 11, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 05, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #002) *Corrected*
Date: December 05, 2023NOTICE OF REJECTION
Date: November 27, 2023NOTICE OF REJECTION
Date: November 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A-Z
Date: November 21, 2023ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: November 21, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) *Corrected*
Date: October 11, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) *Corrected*
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 20, 2023ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 20, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 20, 2023SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 20, 2023REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: August 24, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 20, 2023NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT
Date: August 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 22, 2023ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: August 16, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 22, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY (01 LOT)
Date: June 08, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: June 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: June 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 07, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 06, 2024SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 07, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 03, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 03, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 06, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 03, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003) K-1 form 2019
Date: April 03, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 03, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 03, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 03, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 03, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 03, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 03, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 03, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 06, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 07, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 07, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 07, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 07, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 07, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) April 24, 2015 letter from Anthony Conforti |
||
April 03, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003) Affidavit of Service |
||
April 03, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) Purchase Agreement |
||
April 03, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) K-1 form 2019 K-1 form 2019 Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
April 03, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #003) Chase September 23, 2020- October 22, 2020 |
||
April 03, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #003) Reply Affidavit of Francis Weber Jr. |
||
April 03, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #003) Chase May 22, 2020 - June 19, 2020 |
||
April 03, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #003) Reply Affidavit of Francis Weber |
||
April 03, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #003) Chase September 1, 2020 - September 30, 2020 |
||
April 03, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) Chase May 30, 2020 - June 30, 2020 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.