Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Successor By Merger To Wachovia Mortgage, Fsb Formerly Known As World Savings Bank, Fsb, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Grigg, Natalie Ann, against American Express Bank, Fsb, Gail S Kourbage, Richard Kourbage, United States Of America Department Of The Treasury-Internal Revenue Service, represented by Kourbage, Allison Marie, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts with DENISE F. MOLIA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 27, 2014 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
APPROVED - LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT TO E-FILING
Date: April 29, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #008)
Date: September 26, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: September 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #008)
Date: September 26, 2023STIPULATION - AMENDING CAPTION
Date: August 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #007)
Date: June 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #007)
Date: June 06, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: June 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #007)
Date: June 06, 2023NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK CPLR 8019(C)
Date: August 23, 2022ORDER - VACATING JUDGMENT Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 24, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: December 02, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 03, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: May 03, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: May 03, 2022NOTICE OF PENDENCY (01 LOT)
Date: August 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #006)
Date: May 03, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #006)
Date: July 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #006)
Date: May 03, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: July 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 17, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: August 27, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 27, 2021COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: April 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 07, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 08, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: August 27, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #006)
Date: May 03, 2022ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION
Date: March 29, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 27, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #007)
Date: February 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #007)
Date: February 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #007)
Date: February 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #007)
Date: February 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #007)
Date: February 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #007)
Date: February 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #007)
Date: February 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #007)
Date: February 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #007)
Date: February 28, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: February 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: February 28, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: February 28, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 28, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #007)
Date: February 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #007)
Date: February 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #007)
Date: February 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #007)
Date: February 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #007)
Date: February 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #007)
Date: February 28, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: March 31, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 22, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: April 10, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: May 22, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 22, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: May 09, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 26, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #008) Ex to REply Affirm |
||
September 26, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
September 26, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #008) Exh to Reply Affirm |
||
August 17, 2023 | STIPULATION - AMENDING CAPTION | ||
June 06, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #007) 103648 JXG |
||
June 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #007) historical version of the Department of Financial Services website agency list |
||
June 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #007) Note and Mortgage |
||
June 06, 2023 | PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
June 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #007) USPS Search |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.