Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Anthium Llc, Isanthes, Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Buonincontri, Andrew M, Friedman Vartolo Llp, Nardolillo, Michael William, Vartolo, Ralph Lawrence, against Alan Tuttle As Heir At Law And Next Of Kin Of Russell Joseph Tuttle, Joy Switzer As Heir At Law And Next Of Kin Of Russell Tuttle, Russell Tuttle Jr As Heir At Law And Next Of Kin Of Joseph Russell Tuttle, Timothy Tuttle As Heir At Law And Next Of Kin Of Russell Joseph Tuttle, Tracey S Tuttle, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of St. Lawrence County, NY, . St. Lawrence County, NY Superior Courts with Mary M Farley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary M Farley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 27, 2015 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSt. Lawrence County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: April 27, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Exhibit B (Recorded Mortgage) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Exhibit A (Note) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Exhibit C (Assignments of Mortgage) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: December 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1) 1306 POF Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1) Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 28, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: August 04, 2021COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: April 27, 2015ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: April 28, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: September 17, 2021OATH
Date: December 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1) 90-Day Pre-FC Notice Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1) Assignments of Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Exhibit D (Business Records and Loan History) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 28, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - W Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 28, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: July 28, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: April 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 22, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 08, 2022TERMS OF SALE
Date: March 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 19, 2022BILL OF COSTS Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - X Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 28, 2022NOTICE OF SALE
Date: April 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1) Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: December 13, 2021REFEREE REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE
Date: December 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1) Notice of Default Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 23, 2020JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: March 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 30, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 28, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: December 30, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1) SCRA Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 28, 2022APPENDIX Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #1) Affidavit of Merit and Amounts Due Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 28, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 22, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: March 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 28, 2022FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM
Date: June 21, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 28, 2022COURT NOTICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 28, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 28, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: April 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2022 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
April 19, 2022 | Affidavit of Mailing - Notice of Sale | ||
April 19, 2022 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
March 22, 2022 | Affidavit of Mailing, Notice of Entry | ||
March 22, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Order Confirming Referee Report and Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale |
||
March 15, 2022 | TERMS OF SALE | ||
March 15, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | ||
March 15, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT COVER MEMO |
||
March 15, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER ORDER:INSTRUCTIONS TO FORECLOSURE REFEREE W/SURPLUS $ FORM |
||
February 08, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #1) Amended Notice of Motion for a Default Judgment and Order of Reference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.