Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Kpl Green Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Condon, Brian Keith, against Crazy Beer World Inc, Crazy Beer World, Inc., Greenport Hudson Associates Llc, Morgenstern Devoesick Pllc, Morgenstern Devoesick Pllc, As Escrow Agent, (total of 5) See All represented by Gray, Justin William, Ostrander, Francis Michael, Rickershauser, Stephen G., Rosenbaum, Warren B, Spiegel, Jeffrey Yehuda Aria, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Rockland County. This case was filed in Rockland County Superior Courts with Sherri L Eisenpress presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSherri L Eisenpress Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 29, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 29, 2023ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: November 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 17, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 29, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 29, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 29, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 26, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 26, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 26, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 29, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 26, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 29, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 26, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 29, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 19, 2024RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: December 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 19, 2024COURT NOTICE
Date: December 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: November 20, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 29, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: November 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 17, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 20, 2023ANSWER
Date: November 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 17, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 17, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 17, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 29, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 17, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 29, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: January 17, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: February 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: February 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: February 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: February 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: February 10, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 16, 2023ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: March 21, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: March 16, 2023AFFIDAVIT *Corrected*
Date: March 16, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: March 13, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: March 10, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: March 17, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 14, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 16, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 14, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 14, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 14, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 24, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - U (Motion #002) Email Correspondence from Mr. Condon |
||
January 26, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - T (Motion #002) Email Correspondence from Plaintiff |
||
January 26, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - S (Motion #002) Email Correspondence re Beer Lease |
||
January 26, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #002) DeVoesick Reply Affirmation |
||
January 26, 2024 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #002) Memorandum of Law in Reply and in Further Support of Motion to Disqualify |
||
January 19, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Lena E. Paxos, Esq.'s Affidavit dated January 19, 2024 |
||
January 19, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Lena E. Paxos, Esq., prior Affidavit dated June 23, 2023 as referenced by Defendants |
||
January 19, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Disqualify with Attorney Word Count V Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Disqualify with Attorney Word Count V ... show more |
||
January 17, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) GHA's Deposition Notice - L. Paxos |
||
January 17, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) GHA's First Notice to Produce Documents |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.