Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Bard Avenue Realty Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Bougopoulos, Gregory, against Hava Arifi, Jane Doe, John Doe, represented by Paesano, Emilio, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County. This case was filed in Richmond County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 25, 2019 |
CategoryLandlord And Tenant - Holdover |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
CASE SUMMARY PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: June 25, 2019DECISION/ORDER
Date: December 08, 2020CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY
Date: November 06, 2020STIPULATION AND CONSENT TO E-FILING
Date: June 25, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: November 17, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 14, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 09, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 17, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 09, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #005)
Date: March 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #005)
Date: March 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #005)
Date: March 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #005)
Date: March 02, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (LC)
Date: March 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #005)
Date: March 02, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 05, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 14, 2021COURT NOTICE Â (Motion #003)
Date: December 28, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #06)
Date: August 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #005)
Date: July 23, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #005)
Date: July 22, 2021WARRANT REQUISITION AFTER TRIAL
Date: July 22, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #007)
Date: August 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 30, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - DECLINED/WITHDRAWN Â (Motion #06)
Date: August 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #06)
Date: August 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #06)
Date: August 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 14, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: January 22, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: March 02, 2021LEGACY FILE - PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: May 04, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #005)
Date: March 02, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #005)
Date: March 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: March 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #005)
Date: March 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #005)
Date: March 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #005)
Date: March 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 03, 2021WARRANT REQUISITION AFTER TRIAL
Date: July 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #007)
Date: August 27, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: August 27, 2021NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: August 30, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - DECLINED/WITHDRAWN
Date: August 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #007)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #06)
Date: August 24, 2021NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: August 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #007)
Date: August 27, 2021NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: August 30, 2021NOTICE OF APPEAL *Corrected*
Date: August 25, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #08)
Date: August 30, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 03, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - DECLINED/WITHDRAWN Â (Motion #08)
Date: August 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #06)
Date: August 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - X Â (Motion #08)
Date: August 30, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 22, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #08)
Date: August 30, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 01, 2021COVID-19 HARDSHIP DECLARATION
Date: May 17, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION
Date: June 03, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #09)
Date: August 31, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 17, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: August 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 17, 2021NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: August 23, 2021NOTICE OF APPEAL *Corrected*
Date: August 23, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 20, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - X Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 03, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #06)
Date: August 24, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: August 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 17, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE *Corrected*
Date: May 31, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #06)
Date: August 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - XX Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 03, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: June 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #06)
Date: August 24, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: August 24, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #06)
Date: August 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #06)
Date: August 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #06)
Date: August 24, 2021DECISION/ORDER
Date: July 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #06)
Date: August 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE *Corrected*
Date: August 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #007)
Date: August 27, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - X Â (Motion #09)
Date: August 31, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #007)
Date: August 27, 2021JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION
Date: July 23, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: August 31, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #09)
Date: August 31, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 17, 2021STIPULATION (REQUEST TO SO ORDER)
Date: September 01, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: September 01, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - DECLINED/WITHDRAWN Â (Motion #09)
Date: August 31, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 17, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT
Date: August 20, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #005)
Date: July 23, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #007)
Date: August 27, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2021 |
STIPULATION (REQUEST TO SO ORDER) Post-Eviction Stip re Access |
||
September 01, 2021 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
August 31, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #09) EP Affirmation |
||
August 31, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - X (Motion #09) Various including proof of eviction |
||
August 31, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT EP Aff in Further Support |
||
August 31, 2021 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #09) Post-Eviction OSC |
||
August 31, 2021 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - DECLINED/WITHDRAWN (Motion #09) delined |
||
August 30, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Re NOA re Aug 28 Order |
||
August 30, 2021 |
NOTICE OF APPEAL Re Aug 28 Order |
||
August 30, 2021 | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.