Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
The City Of New York, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Quhshi, Mohamed D., against Jane Doe, John Doe, Teresa Politis, The Land And Building Known As 525 Hunter Avenue, Tax Block #3790, Tax Lot #9, County Of Richmond, City And State Of New York, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County. This case was filed in Richmond County Superior Courts with Lisa Grey presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2022 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Nuisance Abatement) |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 28, 2022NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: December 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 11, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 13, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 11, 2023RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 11, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 11, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 12, 2023ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: January 11, 2023ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 26, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: January 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 03, 2023STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI)
Date: February 17, 2023STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI)
Date: February 17, 2023NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: February 17, 2023NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: February 17, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: February 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
February 17, 2023 |
STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) Stipulation of Settlement (Landlord & Land and Building) |
||
February 17, 2023 |
STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) Stipulation of Settlement (Lessee) |
||
February 17, 2023 |
NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) No Fee Authorization (Stipulation of Settlement - Landlord) |
||
February 17, 2023 |
NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) No Fee Authorization (Stipulation of Settlement - Lessee) |
||
February 03, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affirmation of Service (TRO) |
||
January 27, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
January 26, 2023 |
ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION (Motion #001) Order (proposed) |
||
January 13, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service |
||
January 12, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.