Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank, National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Dagounis, Marika Denise, Gantz, David, Incorvaia, Christina Alicia, Jacobs, Kyle James, Montero, Christhie Maria, (total of 6) See All against Amy Licata, Brian Licata, City Of New York Department Of Transportation Parking Violations Bureau, Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, represented by Schwartz, Beth Patricia, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County, NY, . Richmond County, NY Superior Courts Richmond County Supreme Court with Residential Foreclosure Part presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeResidential Foreclosure Part Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 09, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1448 days |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseRichmond County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1448 days |
ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 14, 2017LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: March 17, 2016LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: July 12, 2018ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 14, 2018ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE
Date: July 13, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 14, 2018JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: June 26, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 02, 2019ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 25, 2019ORDER AND JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE & SALE
Date: June 26, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 24, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 14, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 02, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 02, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - F PRE FORECLOSURE NOTICES Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 09, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: July 09, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - D ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 09, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - H PROOF OF COMPLIANCE Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 09, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - I RECORDED MORTGAGE Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 09, 2015NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: July 09, 2015NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 24, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 09, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: July 09, 2015NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: October 27, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - C RECORDED MORTGAGE Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 09, 2015CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: July 09, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: July 09, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - E LOAN MOD Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 09, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - A NOTE Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 09, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 14, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 14, 2017CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: March 09, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 14, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 31, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 31, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 14, 2018CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: June 09, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 31, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 31, 2017AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY
Date: November 14, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 14, 2017AFFIRMATION
Date: November 14, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 14, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 31, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 31, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 31, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 31, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 14, 2018NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 26, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 14, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 31, 2015RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: February 19, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 19, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 02, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 26, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 02, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 05, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 05, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 26, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 14, 2017ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: February 19, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 14, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 14, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 14, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 14, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 14, 2017NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: August 28, 2018ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: August 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 14, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 14, 2018BILL OF COSTS Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 14, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 05, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 14, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: August 25, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 14, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 14, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 08, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: February 22, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 08, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 22, 2023ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM
Date: February 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: March 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #005)
Date: March 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: March 08, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: March 08, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 09, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 31, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 14, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 08, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
March 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #005) Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale |
||
March 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #005) Order |
||
March 08, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
March 08, 2023 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
February 22, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
February 22, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 07, 2023 | ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM | ||
August 25, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #004) jfs |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.