Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Trustco Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Donovan, Linda Lee, Tobrocke, Melissa Marie, against Anne M. Kuroly, Catherine A. Schwabe, John Doe,, in the jurisdiction of Rensselaer County, NY, . Rensselaer County, NY Superior Courts with Adam W Silverman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAdam W Silverman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 10, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRensselaer County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 01, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 21, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: August 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 04, 2021ORDER - SERVICE BY PUBLICATION
Date: August 31, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 01, 2021ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: August 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 01, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: November 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 01, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: June 10, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: July 08, 2021ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: August 24, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 01, 2021ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: February 23, 2022EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: December 09, 2021REFEREE REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE
Date: March 08, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: December 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 24, 2021ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: February 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #4)
Date: March 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 01, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: February 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: March 08, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: February 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #4)
Date: March 10, 2022AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY
Date: November 01, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 08, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #4)
Date: March 10, 2022BILL OF COSTS
Date: March 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #4)
Date: March 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #4)
Date: March 10, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: December 23, 2021FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM
Date: October 13, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: May 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #4)
Date: March 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #4)
Date: March 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 01, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION
Date: January 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #4)
Date: March 10, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #4)
Date: March 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #4)
Date: March 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #4)
Date: March 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #4) Notice of Entry of Order of Reference
Date: March 10, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 11, 2022AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 02, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: March 10, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: March 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #4)
Date: March 10, 2022NOTICE OF SALE
Date: June 16, 2022AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES
Date: March 10, 2022OATH
Date: June 16, 2022JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: May 17, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #4)
Date: May 11, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 10, 2022REFEREE REPORT OF SALE
Date: October 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: December 09, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 28, 2022EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: August 24, 2021OATH
Date: March 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: August 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #4)
Date: March 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 27, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: October 27, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 27, 2022CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: June 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 01, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 28, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #5) Amended Notice of Motion with New Return Date |
||
October 27, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
October 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #5) Appraisal |
||
October 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #5) Referee's Report of Sale |
||
October 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #5) Referee's Deed |
||
October 27, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
October 27, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
October 13, 2022 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
October 13, 2022 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.