Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc Dba Mr Cooper, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., against Barbara J Johnson, Stephanie V Johnson, represented by Breault, Adam Michael, in the jurisdiction of Rensselaer County, NY, . Rensselaer County, NY Superior Courts with Richard J Mcnally presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard J Mcnally Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 03, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRensselaer County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 12, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: December 31, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: December 31, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 12, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 03, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 18, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 03, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT EXHIBITS H-L
Date: August 12, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 16, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: August 03, 2018FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM
Date: April 10, 2023OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 23, 2019COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: August 03, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - S
Date: October 27, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT EXHIBITS TO MOTION A-F
Date: August 12, 2020REFEREE REPORT OF SALE
Date: March 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F F- 90 day Notice
Date: October 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O
Date: October 27, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 12, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - R
Date: October 27, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: July 01, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: October 27, 2022NOTICE OF SALE
Date: January 10, 2023OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 12, 2020MOTION PAPERS W/EXHIBITS (PRIOR TO CONVERSION)
Date: October 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: October 27, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q
Date: October 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N
Date: October 27, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 22, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: November 05, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M
Date: October 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: October 27, 2022NOTICE OF SALE
Date: December 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P
Date: October 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K
Date: October 27, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 12, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: October 27, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: April 04, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: August 31, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: October 27, 2022BILL OF COSTS
Date: October 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L L- Affidavit of Merit and Amount Due
Date: October 27, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 03, 2020STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: October 27, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 18, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: August 03, 2018NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: October 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: October 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: October 27, 2022RECEIPT OF PAYMENT INTO COURT
Date: October 27, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 12, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: September 08, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: November 16, 2018CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: August 03, 2018CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: August 03, 2018JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: November 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2023 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
March 31, 2023 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
January 10, 2023 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
December 23, 2022 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
November 14, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | ||
October 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - S S- Notice of Appearance |
||
October 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F F- 90 day Notice F- 90 day Notice Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
October 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - O O- Referee's Oath and Report of Amount Due |
||
October 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - R R- N/A |
||
October 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E E- Notice of Default |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.