Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
M&T Equipment Funding Llc F K A M&T Livery Funding Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Leiby, Doron, Miller, Jeffrey R, against Balwinder Singh, Bqb Auto Group, Inc., Bqb Car Services, Inc., Jaswinder Singh, Seven C Corp., (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts with Phillip Hom presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint was filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Queens, by M&T Equipment Funding LLC (formerly known as M&T Livery Funding LLC) against Jaswinder Singh, Balwinder Singh, BQB Car Services Inc., BQB Auto Group Inc., an...
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 05, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 09, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 05, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9
Date: September 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13
Date: September 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14
Date: September 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: September 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12
Date: September 20, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: September 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11
Date: September 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6
Date: September 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: September 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: September 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7
Date: September 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10
Date: September 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: September 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8
Date: September 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: September 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: September 20, 2023SUMMONS
Date: September 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 20, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN LIEU OF COMPLAINT Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 10, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Notice to All Parties of Adjourned Motion Date Pursuant to Court's Directive |
||
November 10, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service |
||
October 09, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) JASWINDER SINGH |
||
October 09, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) BALWINDER SINGH |
||
October 05, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) BQB AUTO GROUP INC. |
||
October 05, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) BQB CAR SERVICES INC. |
||
October 05, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
October 05, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) SEVEN C CORP. |
||
September 20, 2023 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
September 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 9 October 30, 2022 Financing Agreement (12558-2)) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.