Case Last Refreshed: 28 minutes ago
Jan S. Wimpfheimer, Simche Daniel Fulda, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Cohen, Nathan, Francis, Aviva, Newman, Evan M, Rosenberg, Gabriel S, against East Hudson Capital Llc, represented by Chattoraj, Partha Pratim, Sullivan, Mallory Ashton, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts Supreme with Joseph J. Risi presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 23, 2023 |
CategorySpecial Proceeding - Other - Commercial Division (Cplr Article 75) |
Last RefreshedApril 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This complaint is a petition to stay arbitration proceedings brought by Jan S. Wimpfheimer and Simche Daniel Fulda against East Hudson Capital LLC (EHC). The petitioners allege that there was no valid agreement to arbitrate between the parties and th...
ORDER - DISMISSAL Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 11, 2024ORDER - DISMISSAL Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 11, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 04, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 04, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001) Trust Structure Reference Charts
Date: December 04, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 04, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 04, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 04, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 15, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 15, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 16, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 16, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 15, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 16, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 16, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001) Trust Settlement Letters and Powers of Attorney
Date: October 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #001) Wimpfheimer January 2023 Trust Settlement Request
Date: October 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001) Logistec Engagements
Date: October 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #001) Fulda January 2023 Trust Settlement Request
Date: October 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 16, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 11, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 16, 2023ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 02, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 08, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 08, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 06, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 06, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 06, 2023ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: August 23, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 24, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 28, 2023RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE *Corrected*
Date: August 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 24, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: August 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: August 23, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 24, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: August 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: August 23, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: August 23, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: August 23, 2023EMERGENCY APPLICATION - OTHER *Corrected*
Date: August 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: August 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 23, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP *Corrected*
Date: August 23, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: August 23, 2023PETITION
Date: August 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: August 23, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: April 03, 2024NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: August 23, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP *Corrected*
Date: August 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2024 | NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
March 11, 2024 | ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #002) | ||
March 11, 2024 | ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #001) | ||
March 11, 2024 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Notice of Entry with Attached Decision and Order |
||
March 11, 2024 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002) Notice of Entry with Attached Decision and Order |
||
December 04, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #001) Respondent's Reply Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion for Injunctive Relief and in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss Petition |
||
December 04, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001) Reply Affirmation of Pinchas Benay in Further Support of Respondent |
||
December 04, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) State of Florida Company Listing for White Road LLC |
||
December 04, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #001) Promissory Note |
||
December 04, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Trust Structure Reference Charts Trust Structure Reference Charts Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.