Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., As Trustee, For The Certificateholders Of Morgan Stanley Abs Capital I Inc., Trust 2005-Wmc5, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-Wmc5, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Grubea, Jessica Joy, Hinshaw & Culbertson Llp, Matthews, Victor L., Polowy, Amy E., Watson, Terence Durant, (total of 5) See All against John Doe, New York City Department Of Finance, New York City Environmental Control Board, New York City Transit Adjudication Bureau, People Of The State Of New York, (total of 6) See All represented by Gary, Charles Edward, Tordesillas, Bernard James, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts with Robert Ian Caloras presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert Ian Caloras Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 06, 2017 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 28, 2017ANSWER
Date: January 22, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 05, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 18, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 22, 2020NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: November 25, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 29, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 05, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 08, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 02, 2018NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 06, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 06, 2017ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: December 22, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 08, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 05, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 22, 2020HARDSHIP DECLARATION
Date: June 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 22, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 22, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: March 18, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 05, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 22, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 22, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 22, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 02, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 03, 2022ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: May 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 22, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 22, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001) Assignment of Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 03, 2022CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 06, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: December 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 22, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 08, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 05, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 08, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 28, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 08, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 29, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 05, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 23, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 09, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 08, 2018MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: December 22, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2018NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: May 18, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2018CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)
Date: October 16, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 08, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 08, 2018NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES
Date: December 27, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001) Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 03, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 22, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 06, 2018ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001) Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 03, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 22, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 05, 2018ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: December 22, 2020ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: March 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 22, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 31, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 02, 2022DECISION ON MOTION -SUBMIT ORD / JGMT
Date: October 25, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 26, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 26, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 26, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 06, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 06, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 06, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 06, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002) Affirmation of Terence D. Watson |
||
December 06, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 06, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002) Affirmation of Ronald H. Park |
||
December 06, 2022 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #002) Memo of Law in Opposition to Def's Motion to Vacate Default Judgment of Foreclosure |
||
November 28, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 02, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 31, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
October 26, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
October 26, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for the Notice of Entry |
||
October 26, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY with Memorandum |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.