Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Yangsil Kang Individually And As A Shareholder On Behalf Of Elim Home Care Agency, Llc And Evergreen Adult Daycare Center Inc., Yangsil Kang Individually And As A Shareholder On Behalf Of Elim Home Care Agency, Llc And Evergreen Adult Daycare Center Inc., filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Han, Jin-Young, against Byuyngi Koo A K A James Koo, Byuyngi Koo A K A James Koo, Elim Home Care Agency, Llc, Evergreen Adult Daycare Center Inc., Evergreen Adult Day Care In Flushing, Inc., (total of 12) See All represented by Grossman, Andrew David, Raic, Leopold, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court with FREDERICK D. R presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management227 days |
|
Filing DateApril 26, 2019 |
CategoryCommercial - Business Entity |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: May 28, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: April 26, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 28, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 26, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: May 29, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: August 29, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 29, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: April 28, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 28, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 03, 2019ANSWER
Date: September 27, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 29, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: June 12, 2019NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: May 01, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: August 06, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 29, 2019AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 29, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 29, 2019PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: October 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 28, 2019RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: April 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 28, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 28, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 29, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 29, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 29, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 29, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 29, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 28, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 29, 2019SUMMONS (POST RJI) (AMENDED)
Date: May 28, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 29, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 29, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 29, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 28, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 28, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 29, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 29, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 28, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 29, 2019NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: September 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #004) D's Response to P's Demand for Discovery
Date: July 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 29, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 06, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 29, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 06, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 29, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 29, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 29, 2019CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: March 03, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 29, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 31, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 31, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: September 13, 2022STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 31, 2022AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: July 31, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 31, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: August 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 10, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: September 06, 2022ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM
Date: December 17, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: August 19, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: November 25, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 10, 2023AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 10, 2023ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM
Date: November 21, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: January 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #006) Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Document Demand
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #006)
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #006)
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #006)
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #006)
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #006)
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #006)
Date: February 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #006)
Date: February 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: February 14, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #005)
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #006)
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #006)
Date: February 14, 2023AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #006)
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #006)
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #006)
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #006)
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #006)
Date: February 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #005)
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 12, 2023ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM
Date: March 16, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: March 12, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 12, 2023AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: March 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 12, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2023 | ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM | ||
March 13, 2023 | AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH | ||
March 12, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #007) Letter |
||
March 12, 2023 | AFFIRMATION | ||
March 12, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
March 12, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #007) |
||
February 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #006) Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Document Demand Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Document Demand Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
February 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #006) |
||
February 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #006) Stipulation Resolving Motion Sequence 3 |
||
February 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #005) AOS for Supplemental Responses |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.