Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank, National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Di Caro, John A, against Celia A. Walker A K A Celia Walker, City Of New York Environmental Control Board, City Of New York Parking Violations Bureau, City Of New York Transit Adjudication Bureau, John Doe, Said Name Being Fictitious, It Being The Intention Of Plaintiff To Designate Any And All Occupants Of Premises Being Foreclosed Herein, And Any Parties, Corporations Or Entities, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises, (total of 5) See All represented by Mirro, Michele, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court with Denis Butler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDenis Butler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2020 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 24, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 11, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 11, 2020CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: January 24, 2020NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: January 24, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 17, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 11, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 19, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 09, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 09, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 09, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 27, 2020FORECLOSURE -SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INELIGIBLE AFFIRMATION
Date: November 09, 2021SUMMONS
Date: January 24, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 31, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 01, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 26, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 31, 2022SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001) Assignments Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001) Notes Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001) Notice of Default Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 09, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001) Summons & Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001) Military Status Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #001) Affidavits of Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 31, 2022JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 26, 2022BILL OF COSTS Â (Motion #002) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: May 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #003) Department of Defense Search Results Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 26, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #003) Affidavit of Service by Mail Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 26, 2022JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 31, 2022BILL OF COSTS Â (Motion #003) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 26, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 08, 2022ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM
Date: January 31, 2022ORDER - REFERENCE Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 22, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: May 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #001) Affidavit of Merit & Amount Due Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #001) Loan Modification Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 09, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 28, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES
Date: December 07, 2021SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 04, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 13, 2022NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: November 17, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: October 18, 2022SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 14, 2022NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER
Date: February 08, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001) Mortgages Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 26, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #003)
Date: December 12, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #003)
Date: December 19, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #003)
Date: December 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003) Certificate of Merger Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 19, 2022SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: December 19, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 21, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: February 21, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 21, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 23, 2023SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 24, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 17, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2023 |
SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION (Motion #004) Motion Submission Form | Mtn. Seq. 004 |
||
February 23, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #003) adjournment |
||
February 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #004) Reply Affirmation (Motion Seq. 003) |
||
February 21, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
February 21, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #004) Affidavit of Service by Mail |
||
January 20, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
December 19, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #003) Affidavit of Service by Mail |
||
December 19, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #003) Reply Affirmation |
||
December 19, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Certificate of Merger Redacted per 22 NYCRR Certificate of Merger Redacted |
||
December 19, 2022 |
SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION (Motion #003) Motion Submission Form; Mtn. Seq. No. 003 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.