Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Midfirst Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Rogers, Heather C, against John Doe, Mary Doe, Rebecca A. Balcom, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts with Gregory R Gilbert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory R Gilbert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 24, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by MidFirst Bank against Rebecca A. Balcom and other fictitious defendants. The complaint alleges that Rebecca A. Balcom executed a mortgage on March 15, 2016, in the amount of $136,654.00, to secure a loa...
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: December 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 13, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: December 21, 2023STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: December 21, 2023STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: December 21, 2023ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: December 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 13, 2023RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: December 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 05, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 13, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: October 24, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: October 24, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2023 | AFFIRMATION | ||
December 21, 2023 | STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
December 21, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
December 06, 2023 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Notice of Foreclosure Conference Date |
||
December 05, 2023 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
December 05, 2023 | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
December 05, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 13, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE REBECCA A. BALCOM- AOS |
||
November 13, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ADAM ANDERSON S/H/A "JOHN DOE #1"- AOS |
||
November 13, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.