Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Edward Scarano, Susan Scarano, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Crown, Valerie J, Crown, Valerie J., against Babak Ghalili D.D.S., Dean Vafiadis D.D.S. Individuallyand D B A New York Smile Institute, Gary Goldstein D.D.S., Gary Ruth D.D.S., George Anastrassov M.D. D.D.S., (total of 7) See All represented by Adams, Charles J., Embry, Rebecca R., Finger, Barbara S., Fusaro, Cristi L., Greenberg, Rachel Yvette, (total of 14) See All in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with John J Kelley presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 08, 2012 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time2093 days |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #002)
Date: November 20, 2012AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #005)
Date: January 18, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #006)
Date: May 31, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #008)
Date: June 27, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #007)
Date: May 31, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 04, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 31, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: May 31, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #004)
Date: March 10, 2017RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: August 17, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #008)
Date: June 27, 2017STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: August 28, 2017STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: August 21, 2017STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: August 01, 2017NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #005)
Date: February 09, 2017STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: August 30, 2017RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: August 04, 2017STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 01, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #009)
Date: January 10, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: December 22, 2016STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 02, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: December 22, 2016RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: September 13, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #004)
Date: March 06, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #005)
Date: May 31, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #006)
Date: March 20, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #006)
Date: March 03, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #006)
Date: March 03, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #004)
Date: December 28, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #004)
Date: December 28, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: March 03, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #006)
Date: January 18, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #007)
Date: January 18, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #008)
Date: June 28, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #009)
Date: November 27, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 20, 2015RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: December 21, 2017RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: December 28, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #006) *Corrected*
Date: January 19, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #007)
Date: March 03, 2017STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 20, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #007)
Date: March 03, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #007)
Date: March 10, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #007)
Date: January 18, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #009)
Date: October 30, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #006)
Date: January 20, 2017SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: September 14, 2017ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: July 23, 2012ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #005)
Date: January 19, 2017SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: September 07, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: September 05, 2012SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: September 07, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: November 20, 2012STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: October 06, 2014STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: September 28, 2012SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: August 31, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #004)
Date: January 17, 2017ANSWER
Date: July 12, 2012RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: December 07, 2016ORDER - RECUSAL
Date: February 07, 2013NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: July 30, 2015STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: December 19, 2013STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2012DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: December 06, 2012STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: July 21, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #007)
Date: January 23, 2017STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #004)
Date: January 12, 2017SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: September 18, 2017SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: September 15, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #009)
Date: October 30, 2017ANSWER
Date: March 05, 2013NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: July 15, 2015ANSWER
Date: February 18, 2014LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001)
Date: November 15, 2012RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: April 04, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: September 14, 2012ANSWER
Date: August 02, 2012NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: September 14, 2012AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: September 10, 2012NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: April 07, 2014DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: December 06, 2012ORDER - PRE-TRIAL
Date: November 16, 2016NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: January 14, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: September 05, 2012SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: August 31, 2017DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: August 02, 2012RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 03, 2014ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY (Motion #004)
Date: January 12, 2017STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: October 26, 2012ANSWER
Date: August 09, 2012ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #005)
Date: January 18, 2017RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: June 24, 2015NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: October 27, 2014SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: September 07, 2017SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: September 14, 2017RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 05, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
January 10, 2018 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #009) | |
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO DEMAND | |
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) | |
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
December 21, 2017 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO DEMAND | |
December 21, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) | |
December 21, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.