Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Tyvak Nano-Satellite Systems, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Augustine, Joseph Patrick, against Astra Space Operations, Inc., in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts Supreme.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 12, 2024 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract - Commercial Division |
Last RefreshedJune 14, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: June 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 20
Date: June 12, 2024SUMMONS
Date: June 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: June 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 21
Date: June 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18
Date: June 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: June 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6
Date: June 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 19
Date: June 12, 2024COMPLAINT
Date: June 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: June 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10
Date: June 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8
Date: June 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: June 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15
Date: June 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9
Date: June 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16
Date: June 12, 2024ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: June 13, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11
Date: June 12, 2024RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: June 13, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17
Date: June 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7
Date: June 12, 2024COMPLAINT
Date: June 13, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14
Date: June 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12
Date: June 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13
Date: June 12, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2024 | Docket Event | ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C) | |
June 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Commercial Division - Failure to Deliver Prepaid Satellite Propulsion Systems |
|
June 13, 2024 | Docket Event | Complaint - Corrected | |
June 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Subcontract Document 1 General Provisions |
|
June 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 20 April 26, 2024 Email from Martin Attiq to Alma Gonzalez |
|
June 12, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS | |
June 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 PUR-19422, Rev. 1 |
|
June 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 21 May 6, 2024 Email from Andrew Schwartz to Matthew Sant (with attachment) |
|
June 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 18 March 8, 2024 Email from Marc Bell to Chris Kemp |
|
June 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 Change Order 1 (Nov. 3, 2022) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.