Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Elizabeth Tapinekis Individually And On Behalf Of Others Similarly Situated, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Katzman, Peter Bryan, Toptani, Edward G, against Pace University, represented by Fellows, Jonathan Boyce, Messer, Suzanne M., in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Suzanne J. Adams presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 12, 2022 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 11, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 11, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 24, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 01, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: September 12, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 11, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 11, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 11, 2022ANSWER
Date: September 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 11, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 11, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: December 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 11, 2022ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: November 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 11, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 24 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 11, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 11, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 11, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 11, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: November 11, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 11, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 20 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 11, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 19 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 22 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 23 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 21 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 11, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 11, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: December 01, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
December 01, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
December 01, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE for a Scheduling Order |
||
November 26, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
November 11, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) Certificate of Service |
||
November 11, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 16 (Motion #003) Webpage from Pace |
||
November 11, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002) Affirmation of Peter B. Katzman |
||
November 11, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Affirmation of Peter B. Katzman |
||
November 11, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 11, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #002) Certificate of Word Count - Affidavit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.