Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Exrp 14 Holdings Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Cyrulnik, Jason Colin, Fattaruso, Paul, against Ls-14 Ave Llc, represented by Mcdougall, Jennifer Marie, O'Connor, Paul M, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Melissa Anne Crane presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMelissa Anne Crane Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 01, 2022 |
CategoryCommercial - Business Entity - Commercial Division |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - G CLOSING NOTICE Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 01, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 01, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: August 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: August 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H REJECTION NOTICE Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: August 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: August 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: August 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: August 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Extell Rejection of Notice Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Default Notice to Purchaser Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: August 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Direction Letter to Royal Abstract Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Notice Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 01, 2022RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: August 01, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: August 08, 2022ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: August 01, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: August 02, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 30, 2022NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: August 02, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: October 04, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: October 11, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: November 01, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 20, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE
Date: October 24, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: November 16, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 30, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 30, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 30, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 30, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: September 19, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 30, 2022NOTICE OF PENDENCY (AMENDED)
Date: September 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 16, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: December 05, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 01, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 05, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: December 21, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: December 21, 2022NOTICE OF APPEAL Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 04, 2023ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: January 20, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: February 09, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 04, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: January 20, 2023STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: February 09, 2023ORDER - REFERENCE TO ADR
Date: January 30, 2023ORDER - REFERENCE TO ADR
Date: January 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2023 | STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
February 09, 2023 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
January 30, 2023 |
ORDER - REFERENCE TO ADR Amended Order of Reference to Commercial Division ADR Program |
||
January 26, 2023 | ORDER - REFERENCE TO ADR | ||
January 25, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter from Jennifer McDougall to the Court Requesting a Pre-Motion Conference |
||
January 20, 2023 |
ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims |
||
January 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Purchase and Sale Agreement |
||
January 04, 2023 |
NOTICE OF APPEAL (Motion #002) Notice of Appeal of the Decision and Order Denying the Motion to Vacate the Lis Pendens |
||
January 04, 2023 |
NOTICE OF APPEAL (Motion #003) Notice of Appeal of the Decision & Order granting in part and denying in part the Motion to Dismiss |
||
December 21, 2022 | STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.