Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
E.E. Cruz & Company, Inc., filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case represented by Manobianca, Stacy M., Podolak, Gregory David, Small, Bryan Anthony, against Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company, represented by Brehony, Dawn M, Nagel, Anna, Rocco, Charles J, Vicere, Ashley Christine, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Nancy M. Bannon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNancy M. Bannon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 08, 2020 |
CategoryCommercial - Insurance |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
ANSWER
Date: October 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 12, 2021ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: August 25, 2020NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 02, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 12, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 15, 2021SUMMONS WITH NOTICE
Date: June 08, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 12, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: September 04, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 12, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 09, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: October 12, 2021STIPULATION - CONFIDENTIALITY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: September 04, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 08, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 17, 2021ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: March 11, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: March 24, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 30, 2020STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: November 02, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 12, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 24, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 12, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 15, 2021ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: August 19, 2022ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: March 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 05, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: April 05, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 12, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: February 01, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: January 27, 2021STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: January 25, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 09, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: April 27, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 05, 2022ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: April 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 28, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: October 28, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: July 13, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 15, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 30, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: August 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 28, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: August 30, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: August 18, 2022ORDER - INTERIM (MOTION RELATED)
Date: February 17, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 24, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 28, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: April 26, 2022ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: July 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 28, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 19 Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 20 Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 25 Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 26 Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 27 Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 22 Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 28 Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 32 Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18 Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 24 Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 31 Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 36 Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 38 Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 33 Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 35 Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 34 Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 21 Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 29 Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 30 Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 23 Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 37 Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 28, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: October 28, 2022STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 09, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: December 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - W Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 09, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: December 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 09, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 09, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: December 09, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: January 03, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: January 20, 2023RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: January 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: January 20, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF ORAL ARGUMENT Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 10, 2023ORDER - INTERIM (MOTION RELATED) Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 31, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF ORAL ARGUMENT Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 01, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: September 23, 2020COMPLAINT
Date: September 04, 2020DEMAND FOR COMPLAINT
Date: August 17, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2023 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF ORAL ARGUMENT (Motion #004) SO ORDERED |
||
April 10, 2023 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF ORAL ARGUMENT (Motion #004) SO ORDERED |
||
March 31, 2023 |
ORDER - INTERIM (MOTION RELATED) (Motion #004) ADJOURNMENT FOR ORAL ARGUMENT |
||
January 20, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY | ||
January 20, 2023 | RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS | ||
January 20, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
January 03, 2023 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 | ||
December 09, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #004) Rev. Quote |
||
December 09, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #004) Req. Rev. Quote |
||
December 09, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #004) Qual. Control Email |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.