Case Last Refreshed: 6 hours ago
Candace Barasch, Richard Grossman, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Castner, Laura Diane, Lerner, Richard E., Lindstrom, Wendy Jeanne, O'Leary, Katie Ann, against Does 1-10, Lisa Schiff, Schiff Fine Art Llc, Sfa Advisory Llc, represented by Adelman, Ronald Wolf, Cahill, John Robert, Goldstein, Jake Tyler, Pick, Douglas J, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts Supreme with Lucy Billings presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLucy Billings Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 11, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedApril 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This is a complaint filed in New York by two individuals, Candace Barasch and Richard Grossman, as well as their spouses, against Lisa Schiff, Schiff Fine Art LLC (SFA), Schiff Fine Art Advisory LLC (collectively, Defendants). The plaintiffs are suin...
EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 17, 2024NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (POST RJI)
Date: January 17, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 17, 2024NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (POST RJI)
Date: January 16, 2024NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (POST RJI)
Date: January 05, 2024LETTER APPLICATION TO ADMINISTRATIVE JUDGE REQUESTING ASSIGNMENT (RELATED ACTION)
Date: December 29, 2023SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: July 24, 2023ANSWER
Date: September 18, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 27, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: July 21, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 18, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 21, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 14, 2023STIPULATION - AMENDING CAPTION
Date: July 17, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 14, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 30, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 20, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 16, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 16, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 22, 2023RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 17, 2023ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C) Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 17, 2023ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 17, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: May 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 17, 2023NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (PRE RJI)
Date: May 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 17, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: May 17, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: May 17, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 17, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 12, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 11, 2023NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK - AMENDMENT OF CAPTION
Date: July 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B SFA Chapter 7 - Summons |
||
January 17, 2024 | NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (POST RJI) | ||
January 17, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A SFA Chapter 7 Petition |
||
January 16, 2024 | NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (POST RJI) | ||
January 05, 2024 | NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (POST RJI) | ||
December 29, 2023 | LETTER APPLICATION TO ADMINISTRATIVE JUDGE REQUESTING ASSIGNMENT (RELATED ACTION) | ||
September 18, 2023 | ANSWER | ||
July 27, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #002) | ||
July 24, 2023 | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
July 21, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION Notice of posting of $100 undertaking, with proof of payment of funds into court |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.