Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Maria Vera Individually, Melanie Chavez An Infant By Her Mother And Natural Guardian Maria Vera, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Bergman, Michael E, against Howard Miller, Jean Louis, Jofaz Transportation, Inc., Ruth Miller, represented by Carton, Thomas Gerard, Johnson, Robert E., Liebman, Charles David, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Adam Silvera presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2014 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1900 days |
ORDER - OTHER
Date: June 12, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: September 22, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: January 19, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 15, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: February 23, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: January 15, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: February 24, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 19, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 10, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 19, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 10, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 10, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 10, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 10, 2015SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI)
Date: February 19, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 11, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 12, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 10, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 10, 2015EXHIBIT(S)  - c  (Motion #002)
Date: September 22, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 22, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 22, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 22, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 22, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 22, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 22, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 22, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 22, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 22, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 22, 2016AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 04, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 22, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 22, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 04, 2016NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 07, 2016CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY )
Date: September 22, 2016NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 04, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Medical Records Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002) Answers from all Miller defendants Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 18, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 09, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 18, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002) Police Accident Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 18, 2017ORDER - COMPROMISE & SETTLEMENT
Date: January 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002) Transfer Order dated 6/02/2014 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 18, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 03, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002) plaintiffs' S&C and Supplemental S&C Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 18, 2017ORDER (PROPOSED) (AMENDED)
Date: November 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 22, 2016NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: June 17, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 22, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #002) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 18, 2017CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY )
Date: February 24, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 24, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002) plaintiff Vera's EBT transcript Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 18, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Settlement Confirmation Letters Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #002) plaintiffs' Note of Issue Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 18, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Physician Affirmation Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 23, 2021AFFIDAVIT Verified Petition of Guardian Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 23, 2021AFFIRMATION Attorney Affirmation Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 23, 2021INFANT COMPROMISE ORDER (PROPOSED) Proposed Order of Compromise Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002) infant-plaintiff's EBT transript Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 18, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #002) plaintiff Vera's sworn Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 18, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #002) plaintiffs' BP and Supp BP Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 18, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: November 26, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 15, 2019AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: January 15, 2019STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE
Date: February 26, 2018RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 10, 2015ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: April 22, 2014ANSWER
Date: March 17, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 24, 2017STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: November 03, 2016ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 18, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 10, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 09, 2014STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: January 24, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 24, 2015STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: March 24, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 04, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 11, 2014DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: March 27, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 22, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 10, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 19, 2014STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: September 21, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 06, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 17, 2015ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: March 14, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 14, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 19, 2014STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: October 25, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2022 |
ORDER - COMPROMISE & SETTLEMENT so ordered |
||
November 26, 2021 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
November 24, 2021 |
ORDER (PROPOSED) (AMENDED) Amended Proposed Order of Compromise |
||
February 23, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Medical Records Redacted per 22 NYCRR Medical Records Redacted |
||
February 23, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Settlement Confirmation Letters Redacted per 22 NYCRR Settlement Confirmation Letters Redacted |
||
February 23, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Physician Affirmation Redacted per 22 NYCRR Physician Affirmation Redacted |
||
February 23, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT Verified Petition of Guardian Redacted per 22 NYCRR Verified Petition of Guardian Redacted |
||
February 23, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION Attorney Affirmation Redacted per 22 NYCRR Attorney Affirmation Redacted |
||
February 23, 2021 |
INFANT COMPROMISE ORDER (PROPOSED) Proposed Order of Compromise Redacted per 22 NYCRR Proposed Order of Compromise Redacted |
||
March 21, 2019 | Hearing |
MOTION WITHDRAWN (Motion #003) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR STIP Judge: SILVERA, ADAM (DCM) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.