We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Miriam Weisbecker V. J.R. Siwicki Jr., 404 County Rd 39A, Inc., 404 County Road 39A Holdings Inc.

Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago

Miriam Weisbecker, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Hartig, Helene Wasserheit, against 404 County Rd 39A, Inc., 404 County Road 39A Holdings Inc., J.R. Siwicki Jr., represented by Herlihy, Matthew Hannon, Meyer, Zachary, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts .

Case Details for Miriam Weisbecker v. 404 County Rd 39A, Inc. , et al.

Filing Date

August 17, 2023

Category

Commercial - Other (Use And Occupancy/Damages)

Last Refreshed

February 01, 2024

Practice Area

Commercial

Filing Location

New York County, NY

Matter Type

General Commercial

Case Complaint Summary

This complaint is a legal document filed by Miriam Weisbecker against J.R. Siwicki, Jr., 404 County Rd 39A, Inc., and 404 County Road 39A Holdings Inc. The complaint alleges that there was an agreement between the plaintiff and the defendants for the...

Parties for Miriam Weisbecker v. 404 County Rd 39A, Inc. , et al.

Plaintiffs

Miriam Weisbecker

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Hartig, Helene Wasserheit

Defendants

404 County Rd 39A, Inc.

404 County Road 39A Holdings Inc.

J.R. Siwicki Jr.

Attorneys for Defendants

Herlihy, Matthew Hannon

Meyer, Zachary

Case Documents for Miriam Weisbecker v. 404 County Rd 39A, Inc. , et al.

NOTICE OF MOTION

Date: December 20, 2023

EXHIBIT(S)  - A

Date: December 20, 2023

EXHIBIT(S)  - C

Date: December 20, 2023

EXHIBIT(S)  - D

Date: December 20, 2023

EXHIBIT(S)  - B

Date: December 20, 2023

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)

Date: December 15, 2023

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Date: September 22, 2023

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

Date: August 17, 2023

Case Events for Miriam Weisbecker v. 404 County Rd 39A, Inc. , et al.

Type Description
NOTICE OF MOTION
EXHIBIT(S) - A
Summons & Verified Complaint
EXHIBIT(S) - C
Promissory Note & Pledge
EXHIBIT(S) - D
Note Extension
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
EXHIBIT(S) - B
Defendants' Verified Responsive Pleading
EXHIBIT(S) - E
Payments
REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Verified Reply
ANSWER
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Affidavits of Service (5) and Summons & Complaint with Index #
See all events