Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Alexandru Gerea Individually And On Behalf Of All Others Similarly Situated, Andras Bago, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Iadevaia, Jeremiah Joseph, Riley, Kathleen Curtin, against Aba Koiunov, La Brochette, Inc., represented by Kushmakov, Eduard, Sherman, Adam Brad, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Lisa S. Headley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLisa S. Headley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 20, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other (New York Labor Law) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: December 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 04, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 22, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 22, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: January 24, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: December 04, 2023STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE
Date: December 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002) *Corrected*
Date: December 04, 2023ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 18, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: October 06, 2023ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: October 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 06, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 07, 2023NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)
Date: September 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: July 27, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 06, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 14, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: June 13, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 27, 2023NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (PRE RJI)
Date: September 01, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: June 13, 2023ANSWER
Date: June 12, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: May 24, 2023STIPULATION - SERVICE
Date: May 16, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2024 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
December 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion #002) October 31 email |
||
December 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #002) October 6 email |
||
December 22, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #002) Iadevaia affirmation |
||
December 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - S (Motion #002) November 6 email |
||
December 22, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #002) Gerea affidavit |
||
December 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - T (Motion #002) November 8 email (1) |
||
December 22, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY | ||
December 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - U (Motion #002) November 8 email (2) |
||
December 11, 2023 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #002) SO ORDERED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.