Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Feng Yu Gao, George Gao, Tsuei Yen Gao, filed a(n) Special Proceedings - Other (Turnover) case represented by Chen, Jacob Yiping, against Ethan Chen Liang, Ethan Liang 117 East 57Th Street #29A Llc, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Shlomo S. Hagler presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 03, 2023 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Turnover) |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
|
EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 15, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: June 15, 2023ORDER - AMENDED (MOTION RELATED) Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 15, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 13, 2023ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM
Date: June 15, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: June 13, 2023NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: April 03, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: April 03, 2023DECISION ON MOTION -SUBMIT ORD / JGMT
Date: June 15, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 14, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: April 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: April 03, 2023PETITION
Date: April 03, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2023 |
ORDER - AMENDED (MOTION RELATED) (Motion #001) Amended Long Form Order |
||
June 15, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Amended Order |
||
June 15, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
June 15, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Order |
||
June 15, 2023 | ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM | ||
June 15, 2023 | DECISION ON MOTION -SUBMIT ORD / JGMT | ||
June 13, 2023 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
June 13, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Decision |
||
June 13, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
June 12, 2023 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.