Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Joseph Itara, Tabetha Itara, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Nomberg, Brett Jarrod, against Masaryk Towers Corporation D B A Masaryk Towers Management, Metro Management & Development Inc., A K A Metro Management Devel., Inc., represented by Pentola, Michael J, Stromberg, Susan J., in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Eric Schumacher presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEric Schumacher Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 19, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Premises Liability) |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
ANSWER
Date: August 07, 2020STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: July 21, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #005)
Date: July 14, 2022NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: September 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 25, 2021CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: September 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 07, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002) Workers' Compensation Documents Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 25, 2021AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: August 25, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 25, 2021AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 05, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: November 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 25, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: October 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - W Â (Motion #004) Workers' Compensation SROI Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 05, 2021NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: November 03, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 21, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 03, 2021STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - BEFORE JUDGE
Date: September 24, 2021CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 03, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: October 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 03, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 13, 2021NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: December 23, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 21, 2021CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: October 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #007)
Date: July 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 13, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: December 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #006) Death Certificate Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 02, 2023ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: December 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: December 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 07, 2021BILL OF COSTS (PROPOSED)
Date: December 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 07, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: July 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 07, 2021SERVICE ON SUPREME COURT CLERK (GENL. CLERK) W/COPY OF ORDER
Date: July 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 09, 2021STIPULATION - AMENDING PLEADING(S)
Date: November 30, 2021CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: November 03, 2021SERVICE ON SUPREME COURT CLERK (GENL. CLERK) W/COPY OF ORDER Â (Motion #006)
Date: July 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 25, 2021ANSWER
Date: November 05, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 09, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 04, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #003)
Date: December 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 12, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #007)
Date: July 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 03, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: July 17, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 03, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #007)
Date: August 03, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: September 12, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: November 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 03, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: September 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #007)
Date: July 28, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #007)
Date: July 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #007) Death Certificate
Date: July 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #007)
Date: August 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 15, 2022CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: June 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: July 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 15, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: July 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: July 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 02, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 02, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: July 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 12, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: September 07, 2021STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: March 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #006) Itara EBT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 25, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: June 02, 2023AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: October 05, 2021AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: March 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 02, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 05, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: September 29, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 02, 2023THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT *Corrected*
Date: July 14, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: October 07, 2021CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: July 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 25, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 15, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 13, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: June 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 25, 2021CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: July 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 05, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: July 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #002) Request to Centennial & Response
Date: August 25, 2021ORDER - OTHER (NON-MOTION)
Date: July 22, 2021SUMMONS (POST RJI) (AMENDED)
Date: October 05, 2021REMITTITUR
Date: December 30, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: May 03, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 05, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: May 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: December 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 25, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: October 05, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 03, 2021AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 05, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 15, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: May 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 03, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 03, 2021BILL OF COSTS (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #003)
Date: December 16, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: July 20, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 05, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #003)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 02, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: November 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 02, 2023CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: November 23, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 15, 2021STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - BEFORE JUDGE
Date: July 10, 2023ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: April 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #007)
Date: July 28, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: June 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 02, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: September 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #007)
Date: July 28, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 23, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: November 16, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: June 02, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: July 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 02, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #007)
Date: July 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #005)
Date: July 14, 2022DISCOVERY CONFERENCE NOTICE -FROM COURT
Date: March 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 02, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 20, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: July 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 02, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 13, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
November 16, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
September 22, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
August 03, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #007) Affidavit- Maria Guzman |
||
August 03, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #007) Affidavit- Tatiara Werner |
||
July 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #007) Operative Report |
||
July 28, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
July 28, 2023 |
SERVICE ON SUPREME COURT CLERK (GENL. CLERK) W/COPY OF ORDER (Motion #006) Notice of Entry- Decision & Order on Motion Dated 7/14/2023 |
||
July 28, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #007) | ||
July 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #007) Pleadings |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.