Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Board Of Managers Of The 610 Park Avenue Condominium, filed a(n) Liens - Creditor case represented by Holland, Robert T, Wildonger, Kate Elizabeth, against 16Ef Apartment, Llc, John Doe No. 1 Through John Doe No. 15, Mara Enterprises, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Francis A. Kahn Iii presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrancis A. Kahn Iii Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Other (Condo Lien Foreclosure) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeLiens |
This is a foreclosure action to bar and foreclose the lien of the plaintiff and all persons claiming through them or any of them claiming upon liens docketed, as well as all persons or parties making claims subsequent to the filing of the notices of ...
NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 24, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: August 21, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 27, 2023SERVICE ON SUPREME COURT CLERK (GENL. CLERK) W/COPY OF ORDER
Date: August 29, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 27, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 24, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 27, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 27, 2023REFEREE REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE
Date: July 26, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 23, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 11, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: September 29, 2023BILL OF COSTS (PROPOSED)
Date: September 28, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: June 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 27, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: June 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 27, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 02, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 25, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 25, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 02, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 25, 2023SUPPORTING PLEADINGS
Date: April 21, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 07, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 25, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: May 18, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 25, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 25, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: May 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 25, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 25, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - DECLINED/WITHDRAWN
Date: June 06, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 07, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: June 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY NOE of JFS |
||
September 29, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
September 28, 2023 |
BILL OF COSTS (PROPOSED) Foreclosure search invoice for proposed bill of costs |
||
August 30, 2023 |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) (PROPOSED) Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale; (PROPOSED) Bill of Costs; AFFIRMATION in Support of B (PROPOSED) Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale; (PROPOSED) Bill of Costs; AFFIRMATION in Support of B ... show more |
||
August 29, 2023 |
SERVICE ON SUPREME COURT CLERK (GENL. CLERK) W/COPY OF ORDER CPLR 8019 Notice |
||
August 24, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #003) D+O on Motion Seq. No. 003 with Notice of Entry |
||
August 24, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #004) Affidavit of Service with Proof of Mailing of D+O on Motion Seq. No. 004 with Notice of Entry |
||
August 24, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #004) D+O on Motion Seq. No. 004 with Notice of Entry |
||
August 24, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003) Affidavit of Service with Proof of Mailing of D+O on Motion Seq. No. 003 with Notice of Entry |
||
August 21, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.