Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Doris Kaufman, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Drelich, Gloria, against 2451 Broadway Market, Inc., New Horizon Management Corp., Yucca Holding Corp., represented by Bonanno, John Perry, Ellman, Stephen Frederick, Leinbach, Bryan D, Sweeney, Michael J, Weisberg, Harold H, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Alexander M Tisch presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management168 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2014 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
VerdictDefendant |
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1539 days |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #004)
Date: September 20, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: December 08, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #003)
Date: September 11, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: September 11, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #003)
Date: September 11, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #003)
Date: September 11, 2017STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: July 15, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #003)
Date: September 11, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #004)
Date: September 20, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #004)
Date: September 20, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #004)
Date: September 20, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #004)
Date: September 20, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #004)
Date: September 20, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #005)
Date: February 02, 2018DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 19, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #005)
Date: March 05, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #005)
Date: February 02, 2018DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: December 19, 2017ANSWER
Date: December 19, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #005)
Date: March 28, 2018STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: November 14, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #006)
Date: February 06, 2018ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: April 02, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #005)
Date: February 15, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: January 14, 2016SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: August 10, 2017ANSWER
Date: April 23, 2014STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: August 17, 2015SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: June 29, 2017SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: July 06, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #006)
Date: April 20, 2018STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: October 26, 2015ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #005)
Date: February 02, 2018DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: December 11, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: January 03, 2017STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: December 20, 2017SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: April 18, 2018DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: December 11, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #004)
Date: September 22, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #004)
Date: September 20, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #003)
Date: September 13, 2017STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: February 02, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: April 27, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 29, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
|
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event | VERDICT SHEET | |
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event | TRIAL DOCUMENTS | |
August 03, 2018 | Docket Event | EXTRACT | |
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #006) | |
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED SEE COMMENT 014 |
|
April 17, 2018 | Hearing |
VERDICT FOR DEFENDANT IAS TRIAL READY 52 9:30AM (DAY 4) Judge: TISCH, ALEXANDER M. |
|
April 16, 2018 | Hearing |
ON TRIAL IAS TRIAL READY 52 9:30AM (DAY 3) Judge: TISCH, ALEXANDER M. |
|
April 13, 2018 | Hearing |
ON TRIAL IAS TRIAL READY 52 9:30AM (DAY 2) Judge: TISCH, ALEXANDER M. |
|
April 12, 2018 | Hearing |
ON TRIAL IAS TRIAL READY 52 10:00AM (DAY 1) Judge: TISCH, ALEXANDER M. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.